This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/26/2016 at 15:28:58 (UTC).

18400 COLLINS LLC VS LYLES, MICHAEL

Case Summary

On 04/17/2009 18400 COLLINS LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LYLES, MICHAEL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2367

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

18400 COLLINS LLC

Defendant

LYLES MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FELMAN, EDWARD L

Defendant Attorney

LYLES, MICHAEL E.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2009
  • WRIT RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2009
  • NON-JURY TRIAL CONCLUDED - JUDGMENT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2009
  • STIPULATION JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2009
  • WRITTEN STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2009
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2009
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2009
  • NON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 05/19/09, 08:30 AM, DEPT NWP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2009
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FOR ALL UNNAMED TENANTS SUBMITTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FOR ALL UNNAMED TENANTS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2009
  • JUDGMENT FOR ALL UNNAMED TENANTS TENTATIVELY GRANTED PURSUANT TO CCP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2009
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED-30 MIN(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2009
  • FEE WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2009
  • A/C - ANSWER FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2009
  • RESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2009
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2009
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 18400 COLLINS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FELMAN EDWARD LUIS