This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/25/2016 at 08:54:55 (UTC).

18400 COLLINS LLC VS DAVIS, ANTONIO

Case Summary

On 10/14/2008 18400 COLLINS LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DAVIS, ANTONIO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6417

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

18400 COLLINS LLC

Defendant

DAVIS ANTONIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLOCK, DENNIS P.

Defendant Attorney

DAVIS, ANTONIO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2012
  • WRIT RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2008
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2008
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED AND ISSUED+

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2008
  • WRITTEN STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2008
  • STIPULATION JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2008
  • NON-JURY TRIAL CONCLUDED - JUDGMENT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2008
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2008
  • NON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 12/04/08, 08:30 AM, DEPT NWP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2008
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED-20 MIN(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2008
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FOR ALL UNNAMED TENANTS SUBMITTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FOR ALL UNNAMED TENANTS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2008
  • JUDGMENT FOR ALL UNNAMED TENANTS TENTATIVELY GRANTED PURSUANT TO CCP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2008
  • RESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2008
  • FEE WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2008
  • A/C - ANSWER FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2008
  • A/C - FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2008
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2008
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2008
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 18400 COLLINS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BLOCK DENNIS P.