This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/27/2016 at 07:52:33 (UTC).

18400 COLLINS LLC VS BOWLES, BARRY

Case Summary

On 07/02/2009 18400 COLLINS LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BOWLES, BARRY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4081

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

18400 COLLINS LLC

Defendant

BOWLES BARRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FELMAN, EDWARD L

Defendant Attorney

BOWLES, BARRY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2009
  • WRIT RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2009
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2009
  • NON-JURY TRIAL CONCLUDED - JUDGMENT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2009
  • STIPULATION JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2009
  • WRITTEN STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2009
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED-30 MIN(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2009
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2009
  • NON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 07/28/09, 08:30 AM, DEPT NWP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2009
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2009
  • RESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2009
  • FEE WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2009
  • A/C - FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2009
  • ORDER TO POST SUMMONS SIGNED BY COMMISSIONER M. J. BLOCK++

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2009
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2009
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER TO POST SUMMONS SUBMITTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2009
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 18400 COLLINS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FELMAN EDWARD LUIS