This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/26/2016 at 15:29:41 (UTC).

13910 SHERMAN WAY LLC VS ALVAREZ, GEOVANNY A.

Case Summary

On 04/17/2009 13910 SHERMAN WAY LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ALVAREZ, GEOVANNY A. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2375

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

13910 SHERMAN WAY LLC

Defendants

ALVAREZ GEOVANNY A.

ALVAREZ MARIA G.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZAKARI, RAYMOND V

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2015
  • CASE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GC 68152 D(1)/GC 68152 D(2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2010
  • WRIT RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2009
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2009
  • A/C - COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2009
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2009
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FOR ALL UNNAMED TENANTS SUBMITTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2009
  • MEMO TO SET REJECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2009
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED-20 MIN(S) * * REJECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2009
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2009
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FOR ALL UNNAMED TENANTS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2009
  • JUDGMENT FOR ALL UNNAMED TENANTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO CCP 415.46

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2009
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2009
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 13910 SHERMAN WAY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZAKARI RAYMOND V