This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/30/2016 at 18:41:48 (UTC).

Zimmerman, Tom Vs Stubblefield, Greg

Case Summary

On 03/12/2001 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Zimmerman Tom against Stubblefield Greg in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0566

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alhambra Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Richard Morrow

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Zimmerman Tom

Defendant

Stubblefield Greg

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2014
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/28/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE ALHAMBRA COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM PAS01S00566 TO ALH01SP0566

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2001
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. NEM , HON. RICHARD MORROW PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING BY TOM ZIMMERMAN, IN PRO PER . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2001
  • COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2001
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 04/11/01 . FOR (ZIMMERMAN, TOM) . AGAINST (STUBBLEFIELD, GREG) . PRINCIPAL $ 3874.00 . COSTS $ 27.00 . TOTAL $ 3901.00 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2001
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2001
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT FILED. SERVED AS TO (STUBBLEFIELD, GREG) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 04/11/01 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. NEM . SIGNED FOR BT DORIS PRAVECEK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN 021. HEARING SET FOR 04/11/01 AT 01:30 PM IN DIV. NEM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.