This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2016 at 22:46:36 (UTC).

ZHOU, WENSHENG VS. BROBERG, ELIZABETH

Case Summary

On 11/15/2005 ZHOU, WENSHENG filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BROBERG, ELIZABETH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Malibu Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0233

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Malibu Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZHOU WENSHENG

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

BROBERG ELIZABETH

PAQUETTE JUSTIN THOMAS

TAYLOR BROTHERS ARCHITECTURAL PRODUCTS

FENG WENFEI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF RICK W. MANTHEI - RICK W. MANTHEI

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF RICK W. MANTHEI

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

SHAFFER & ASSOCIATES - DAVID K. STEWART

Attorney at SHAFFER & ASSOCIATES

LAW OFFICES OF LINDA M. LIBERTUCCI - TED R CRISLER

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF LINDA M. LIBERTUCCI

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2010
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2006
  • UPON A SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE HEREIN IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE MATTER OF COAST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY V. FENG WENFEI, ET AL CASE NUMBER 05V00170, BE CONSOLIDATED WITH WENSHENG ZHOU V. ELIZABETH BROBERG, ET AL., CASE NUMBER 05V00233. THE MASTER FILE SHALL BE COAST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY V FENG SENFEI, ET AL., CASE NUMBER 05V00170.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2006
  • PURSUANT TO AN ORDER FOR CONSOLIDATION OF CASES, THE ENTIRE FILE UNDER THIS CASE NUMBER IS ORDERED CONSOLIDATED WITH THE LEAD NUMBER 05V00170, AND ALL FUTURE DOCUMENTS SHALL BE FILED UNDER SAID CASE NUMBER HEREAFTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2006
  • ANSWER OF CROSS-DEFENDANT(S): (BROBERG, ELIZABETH) TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF CROSS-COMPLAINANT(S): (TAYLOR BROTHERS ARCHITECTURAL PRODUCTS) , (PAQUETTE, JUSTIN THOMAS) FILED. RECEIPT # N/A .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2006
  • THE COURT ORDERS THIS MATTER SET FOR STATUS CONFERENCE AND MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE WITH CASE 05V00170 ON SEPTEMBER 11, 2006, 8:30 A.M., DEPARTMENT 1. . ATTORNEY TED CRISLER TO GIVE NOTICE TO ALL SIDES. .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2006
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2006
  • ANSWER FILED OF (TAYLOR BROTHERS ARCHITECTURAL PRODUCTS) , (PAQUETTE, JUSTIN THOMAS) . RECEIPT # N/A .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2006
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED. CROSS-COMPLAINANT(S): (TAYLOR BROTHERS ARCHITECTURAL PRODUCTS) , (PAQUETTE, JUSTIN THOMAS) . CROSS-DEFENDANT(S): (FENG, WENFEI) , (BROBERG, ELIZABETH) . RECEIPT # N/A .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2006
  • SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT ISSUED. CROSS-COMPLAINT #02.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2006
  • SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED . CROSS-COMPLAINT #02 .

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2006
  • ANSWER FILED OF (BROBERG, ELIZABETH) . RECEIPT # MAL136401008 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2006
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY (BROBERG, ELIZABETH) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2006
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED. CROSS-COMPLAINANT(S): (BROBERG, ELIZABETH) . CROSS-DEFENDANT(S): (PAQUETTE, JUSTIN THOMAS) , (TAYLOR BROTHERS ARCHITECTURAL PRODUCTS) . RECEIPT # N/A .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2006
  • SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT ISSUED. CROSS-COMPLAINT 01.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2006
  • SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED . CROSS-COMPLAINT 01 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2005
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (ZHOU, WENSHENG) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2005
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN MAL510618027.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2005
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2005
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 04/19/06 AT 10:00A M, IN DIV/DEPT. CLK . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 11/15/05

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2005
  • CLERK`S NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.