Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2016 at 10:29:01 (UTC).

ZAGE INVESTMENT CO. VS. PRECIADO, DAVID F.

Case Summary

On 05/12/2004 ZAGE INVESTMENT CO filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against PRECIADO, DAVID F. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Culver City Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RALPH AMADO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1426

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Culver City Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RALPH AMADO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZAGE INVESTMENT CO.

Defendants

ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS

GENTRY JUDY ANN

PRECIADO DAVID F.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF MICHAEL J. MEADE - MICHAEL J. MEADE

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF MICHAEL J. MEADE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 03/16/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2004
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 75.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2004
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # CUL462301003 . MAILED TO ATTY OFC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2004
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE EXHIBITS/DEPOSITIONS ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2004
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 10:30A M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. RALPH AMADO, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. PLAINTIFF(S) APPEARING BY MICHAEL J. MEADE, ESQ . DEFENDANT(S) APPEARING IN PRO PER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2004
  • STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2004
  • JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2004
  • COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2004
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 06/18/04 . FOR (ZAGE INVESTMENT CO.) . AGAINST (PRECIADO, DAVID F.) , (GENTRY, JUDY ANN) , (ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS) . FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 9846 GLASCOW PLACE #4, LOS ANGELES, CA 90045 .

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/28/2004
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2004
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2004
  • ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION(S) FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS OF (PRECIADO, DAVID F.) , (GENTRY, JUDY ANN) SIGNED AND FILED. PAYMENT OF ALL THE FEES AND COSTS LISTED IN RULE 985(I), CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT IS WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2004
  • GENERAL DENIAL FILED OF (PRECIADO, DAVID F.) , (GENTRY, JUDY ANN) . RECEIPT # FEE WAIVER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2004
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY (PRECIADO, DAVID F.) , (GENTRY, JUDY ANN) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2004
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DIV003 RE: FEE WAIVER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2004
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2004
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN CUL485132010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2004
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2004
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 06/23/04 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ATTORNEY AT LAW - MICHAEL J. MEADE