Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2016 at 06:18:51 (UTC).

WRIGHT, RICHARD VS. SAYEM, ZAHANUIR, DR.

Case Summary

On 10/05/2004 WRIGHT, RICHARD filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SAYEM, ZAHANUIR, DR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Culver City Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOSEPH S. BIDERMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3041

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Culver City Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOSEPH S. BIDERMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WRIGHT RICHARD

Defendant

SAYEM ZAHANUIR DR.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 03/16/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2004
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 , HON. JOSEPH S. BIDERMAN PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT . MOTION IS DENIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2004
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2004
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY (SAYEM, ZAHANUIR, DR.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2004
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION RE: MOTION FOR ORDER TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. FILE SENT TO DIV. 001 . RECEIPT # 985(I)CRC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2004
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 , HON. JOSEPH S. BIDERMAN PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER QUASHING SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT AND SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT: . APPLICATION GRANTED. THE ORDER IS SIGNED AND FILED AND REFLECTS THE FOLLOWING: EXECUTION OF WRIT OF POSSESSION IS ORDERED STAYED UNTIL 11-5-04 AT 5PM IN DIV 1. OPPOSITION TO SAID MOTION MUST BE MADE BY 11-3-04 AND FILED WITH THIS COURT AND SERVED ON 11-4-04.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2004
  • CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER FORWARDED TO THE SHERIFF'S OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2004
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 11/05/04 AT 09:00A M, IN DIV. 001 . RE: MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE/ VACATE JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2004
  • ORDER RE: GRANTING OF EX PARTE APPLICATION IN PART IS SIGNED BY JOSEPH S. BIDERMAN AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2004
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (SAYEM, ZAHANUIR, DR.) FOR REJECTION OF THE MOTION FOR ORDER QUASHING SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT AND SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT IS BEING RETURNED. THE COURT REQUIRES YOU TO RESERVE THE HEARING DATE ON YOUR MOTION, WITH THE CLERK IN DIVISION 001 SUBMITTED ON 10/25/04

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2004
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # CUL462301006 . P/U AT COUNTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2004
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 11.66 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2004
  • SUMMONS AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED. REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (SAYEM, ZAHANUIR, DR.) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2004
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2004
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 10/14/04 . FOR (WRIGHT, RICHARD) . AGAINST (SAYEM, ZAHANUIR, DR.) . FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 3804 W. SLAUSON AVE., LOS ANGELES, CA 90043 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2004
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN CUL488416002.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2004
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2004
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2004
  • NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO APPEAR FILED AND MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 11/04/04 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less