This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/20/2017 at 07:50:20 (UTC).

WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING, LL VS. KARUNARATN, CARMEN

Case Summary

On 05/25/2012 WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING, LL filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against KARUNARATN, CARMEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0239

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Beverly Hills Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING LLC

Defendant

KARUNARATN CARMENAKA KARUNARATNA CARMENAKA K

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF RORY W. CLARK - RORY W. CLARK

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF RORY W. CLARK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2012
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED AS TO (KARUNARATN, CARMEN)AKA (KARUNARATNA, CARMEN)AKA (KARUNARATNA, CARMEN S.) . DATE OF SERVICE WAS ON 06/20/12 . NO ENFORCEABLE EXECUTION TO ISSUE PRIOR TO 07/20/12 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2012
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED, $ 392.04 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2012
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 125.00 FILED BY (WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING, LLC) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT RECEIVED AND NEW CASE FILE OPENED. ALL PAPERS PREVIOUSLY FILED UNDER THIS CASE NUMBER ARE PLACED INTO THE NEW ASSIGNED CASE NUMBER 03C00239 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED. TOTAL JUDGMENT RENEWED IN THE SUM OF $ 1017.90 . RECEIPT # 451225006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT HAVING BEEN FILED, ALL PAPERS PREVIOUSLY FILED UNDER CASE NUMBER 03C00239 ARE PLACED INTO THE CASE FILE UNDER THIS NUMBER. JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2012
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON THE APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT AS A FINAL DISPOSTION ON 05/25/12 , FOR (WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING, LLC) , AGAINST (KARUNARATN, CARMEN)AKA (KARUNARATNA, CARMEN)AKA (KARUNARATNA, CARMEN S.) , PRINCIPAL (LINE E) $ 595.86 , INTEREST AFTER JUDGMENT (LINE F) $ 392.04 , FEE FOR FILING RENEWAL (LINE G) $ 30.00 . TOTAL $ 1,017.90 . RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED ON 05/25/12 W/SAME CASE #03C00239, JUDGMENT RENEWED,,,OLD JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 06/11/2003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2012
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT STAYED UNTIL PROOF OF SERVICE IS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2012
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY WHOLLY UNSATISFIED. COSTS $ 0.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2011
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 65.00 FILED BY (WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING, LLC) .

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 06/11/2003
  • MOTOR VEHICLE CONTRACT WITH SECURITY AGREEMENT, ASSIGNMENT AND REPOSSESSION DOCUMENTS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2003
  • ASSIGNMENT OF ACCOUNT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2003
  • DECLARATION RE: RORY W. CLARK PURSUANT TO C.C.P., SECTION 1033 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2003
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY CLERK FOR DEFAULT ENTERED OF (KARUNARATN, CARMEN)AKA (KARUNARATNA, CARMEN)AKA (KARUNARATNA, CARMEN S.) ON 06/11/03 FILED. DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 157.25 , AND DECLARATON OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2003
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2003
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 06/11/03 . FOR (WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING, LLC) . AGAINST (KARUNARATN, CARMEN)AKA (KARUNARATNA, CARMEN)AKA (KARUNARATNA, CARMEN S.) . PRINCIPAL $ 1169.87 . ATTY. FEES $ 0.00 . INTEREST $ 230.77 . COSTS $ 157.25 . TOTAL $ 1,557.89 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2003
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT, CASE ASSIGNMENT CASE MANAGEMENT FILED. SERVED AS TO (KARUNARATN, CARMEN)AKA (KARUNARATNA, CARMEN)AKA (KARUNARATNA, CARMEN S.) SERVED JOHN DOE-CO-RESIDENT . COSTS OF $ 36.95 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2003
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN BH278865009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2003
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2003
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 07/02/03 AT 10:00A M, IN DIV/DEPT. 006 . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 02/03/03

    Read MoreRead Less