This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2016 at 10:33:26 (UTC).

WESTPARK APARTMENTS VS. GOODWIN, AISHA L.

Case Summary

On 05/17/2004 WESTPARK APARTMENTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GOODWIN, AISHA L. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Culver City Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RALPH AMADO and DIANA M. WHEATLEY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1477

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RALPH AMADO

Judge

DIANA M. WHEATLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTPARK APARTMENTS

Defendants

ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS

GOODWIN AISHA L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEPHEN C. DURINGER & ASSOCIATES - STEPHEN C. DURINGER

Attorney at STEPHEN C. DURINGER & ASSOCIATES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2007
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2007
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 05/30/07 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2006
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO SANTA MONICA LIMITED CLERK'S OFFICE RE: ROBIN .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2006
  • ORDER RE: REQUEST TO VACATE JUDGMENT AND ENTER DISMISSAL SIGNED BY DIANA M. WHEATLEY, JUDGE AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2006
  • ORDER PURSUANT TO STIPULATION TO VACATE JUDGMENT AGAINST (GOODWIN, AISHA L.) SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2006
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2006
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO WED RE: DECLARATION TO VACATE JUDGMENT AND TO DISMISS ACTION; ORDER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2006
  • DECLARATION RE: TO VACATE JUDGMENT AND TO DISMISS ACTION; ORDER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2004
  • EXHIBITS ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION 1952(D) CCP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2004
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE EXHIBITS/DEPOSITIONS ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2004
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2004
  • ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION(S) FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS OF (GOODWIN, AISHA L.) SIGNED AND FILED. PAYMENT OF ALL THE FEES AND COSTS LISTED IN RULE 985(I), CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT IS WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2004
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2004
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2004
  • ANSWER FILED OF (GOODWIN, AISHA L.) . RECEIPT # FEE WAIVER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2004
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY (GOODWIN, AISHA L.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2004
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DIV003 RE: FEE WAIVER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2004
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN CUL485132015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2004
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2004
  • NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO APPEAR FILED AND MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 06/21/04 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DURINGER STEPHEN C.