This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/08/2016 at 10:44:10 (UTC).

WESTCREEK PROPERTIES LTD. VS. PALMER, JACKLYN

Case Summary

On 03/21/2005 WESTCREEK PROPERTIES LTD filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against PALMER, JACKLYN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Clarita Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0285

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTCREEK PROPERTIES LTD. A CALIFORNIA LTD. PARTNERSHIP

Defendant

PALMER JACKLYN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANDELBAUM & ROBISON - SHERYL MANDELBAUM ESQ

Attorney at MANDELBAUM & ROBISON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2006
  • DocketCASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2006
  • DocketPURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 05/12/06 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2005
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 103.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2005
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2005
  • DocketJUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2005
  • DocketJUDGMENT ENTERED ON 04/05/05 . FOR (WESTCREEK PROPERTIES LTD.) A CALIFORNIA LTD. PARTNERSHIP . AGAINST (PALMER, JACKLYN) . FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 24205 BAMBOO LANE #102, SANTA CLARITA, CA 91321 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2005
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE: EXHIBITS/ DEPOSITION ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2005
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 48.33 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2005
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # NEW467864012 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2005
  • DocketSUMMONS WITH PROOF OF SERVICE FILED. SERVED AS TO (PALMER, JACKLYN) . COSTS OF $ 30.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2005
  • DocketREQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (PALMER, JACKLYN) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED. REQUEST FOR CLERK'S JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2005
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2005
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN NEW467864017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2005
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2005
  • DocketMATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 05/27/05 AT 10:00A M, IN DIV. 004 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESTCREEK PROPERTIES LTD is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MANDELBAUM, SHERYL