Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2016 at 08:03:05 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO FINANCIAL CALIFORN VS. WHITE,VINCENT H.

Case Summary

On 01/22/2004 WELLS FARGO FINANCIAL CALIFORN filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WHITE,VINCENT H. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Culver City Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0206

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Culver City Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO FINANCIAL CALIFORNIA INC.A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

WHITE VINCENT H.AKAWHITE VINCENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUFFMAN & KOSTAS - JAMES CHRISTOPHER KOSTAS APC

Attorney at HUFFMAN & KOSTAS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2006
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2006
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 08/31/06 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2004
  • RECEIVED THE SUM OF $ .57 FOR PHOTOCOPIES. RECEIPT # CUL319437001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2004
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2004
  • SUMMONS FILED WITH PROOF OF SERVICE THEREON AS TO (WHITE,VINCENT H.)AKA(WHITE,VINCENT) (AMENDED) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2004
  • MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO 04/15/04 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2004
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2004
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2004
  • ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION(S) FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS OF (WHITE,VINCENT H.)AKA(WHITE,VINCENT) SIGNED AND FILED. PAYMENT OF ALL THE FEES AND COSTS LISTED IN RULE 985(I), CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT IS WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2004
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DIV003 RE: FEE WAIVER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2004
  • ANSWER FILED OF (WHITE,VINCENT H.)AKA(WHITE,VINCENT) . RECEIPT # FEE WAIVER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2004
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY (WHITE,VINCENT H.)AKA(WHITE,VINCENT) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2004
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO ATTY FOR PLAINTIFF FOR REJECTION OF PROOF OF SERVICE RETURNED. DEFENDANT MUST BE SERVED AS SUED. SUBMITTED ON 03/08/04

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2004
  • AMENDED NOTICE OF OSC RE: COMPLIANCE MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2004
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2004
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN 519437013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2004
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2004
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 03/30/04 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2004
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 06/24/04 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV/DEPT. 001 . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 01/23/04

    Read MoreRead Less