This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/02/2016 at 07:36:44 (UTC).

Watkins, Sharon Vs. Taylor, Phillis

Case Summary

On 03/12/2001 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Watkins Sharon against Taylor Phillis in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0651

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downey Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Michael Schuur

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Xxx

Watkins Sharon

Defendant

Taylor Phillis

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2005
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2001
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 , HON. COMMISSIONER MICHAEL SCHUUR PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . DEFENDANT APPEARING * . THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2001
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2001
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (TAYLOR, PHILLIS) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 04/12/01 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 . COSTS OF $ 30.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # PAID . HEARING SET FOR 04/12/01 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.