This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/02/2016 at 09:07:53 (UTC).

Washington Mutual Finance, Inc Vs. Meta, Javier

Case Summary

On 03/12/2001 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Washington Mutual Finance Inc against Meta Javier in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, San Fernando Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0792

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Fernando Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Michael Duberchin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Washington Mutual Finance Inc.

Defendant

Meta Javier

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2002
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2001
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 134 , HON. RAYMOND GILL, JUDGE PRO TEMPORE PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2001
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2001
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 134 , HON. COMMISSIONER, KEVIL W. MARTIN PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON 08/24/01 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 134 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2001
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2001
  • PARTY REPRESENTATIVE DECLARATION FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2001
  • PARTY REPRESENTATIVE DECLARATION FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2001
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 134 , HON. GEORGE C. LIN, JUDGE PRO TEMPORE PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON 07/20/01 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 134 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2001
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2001
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 134 , HON. MICHAEL DUBERCHIN, JUDGE PRO TEMPORE PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON 06/01/01 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 134 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2001
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2001
  • PARTY REPRESENTATIVE DECLARATION FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2001
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (META, JAVIER) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 04/20/01 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 134 . COSTS OF $ 35.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN LAS474901028. HEARING SET FOR 04/20/01 AT 01:30 PM IN DIV. 134.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.