This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/29/2016 at 17:52:33 (UTC).

Washington Mutual Finance, Inc Vs. Holman, Dolores

Case Summary

On 03/12/2001 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Washington Mutual Finance Inc against Holman Dolores in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0332

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alhambra Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Donald S. Kennedy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Washington Mutual Finance Inc.

Defendant

Holman Dolores

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2003
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2001
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2001
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 002 , HON. DONALD S. KENNEDY, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING BY CARLOS TENA, SWORN AND TESTIFIED . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2001
  • COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST; REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED IN OPEN COURT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2001
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 002 , HON. DONALD S. KENNEDY, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING BY CARLOS TANYA . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2001
  • MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON 05/01/01 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 002 . RECEIPT # .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2001
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2001
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (HOLMAN, DOLORES) BY SUB-SERVING CHRISTA DOE, REFUSED LAST NAME, CO-OCCUPANT . COSTS OF $ 35.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # ALH135486020 . HEARING SET FOR 04/19/01 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • DECLARATION RE: NON-MILITARY SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.