Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/06/2016 at 12:44:19 (UTC).

WALKER, BARBARA VS. MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/29/2002 WALKER, BARBARA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Monrovia Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ANTY J. ROBINSON and THOMAS KEISER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0341

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Monrovia Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ANTY J. ROBINSON

THOMAS KEISER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FUTCH YVETTE

WALKER JESSE

WALKER BARBARA

Defendants

MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY ERRONEOUSLY NAMED AND SUED AS F

MID CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATTORNEY AT LAW - RICHARD MEAGLIA

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL A. BRANCONIER - COOPER KARDARAS KELLEHER LLP

Attorney at MICHAEL A. BRANCONIER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2003
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2002
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2002
  • NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED BY (MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY) ERRONEOUSLY NAMED AND SUED AS (FARMERS INSURANCE GROUP) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2002
  • NEXT ACTION DUE 03/29/07 AT 09:00A M, IN DIV. KLM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2002
  • PURSUANT TO TELEPHONE CALL FROM DEFENDANT'S COUNSEL, MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT/ TRIAL/HEARING DATE PLACED OFF CALENDAR. CASE SETTLED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2002
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 10:30A M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. THOMAS KEISER, TEMPORARY JUDGE PRESIDING FOR STATUS CONFERENCE. PURSUANT TO TELEPHONE CALL FROM PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, MOTION TO CONTINUE IS GRANTED (CASE SETTLED). THE COURT ORDERS THE MATTER CONTINUED TO 09/18/02 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 003 . COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2002
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (WALKER, BARBARA) FOR REJECTION OF ABSTRACT: NO JUDGMENT ON FILE . SUBMITTED ON 08/01/02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2002
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 10:30A M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. ANTHONY J. ROBINSON, TEMPORARY JUDGE PRESIDING RE: MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT.MOTION MADE BY PLAINTIFF TO CONTINUE MATTER & ADVANCE THE STATUS OF 7/30/02. GRANTED. . COURT ORDERS MATTER CONTINUED TO 08/02/02 AT 10:30A M, IN DIV. 003 . THE COURT ORDERS THE STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING DATE OF JULY 30, 2002 ADVANCED AND CONTINUED TO SAME DATE AS MOTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2002
  • MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING RE: STATUS CONFERENCE TO 08/02/02 AT 10:30A M, IN DIV. 003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2002
  • LETTER RE: PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL UNAVAILABILITY FOR MOTION DATE OF 7/26/02 RECEIVED FROM DEFENDANTS COUNSEL, MICHAEL T. OSHIRA AND PLACED INTO THE CASE FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2002
  • OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE, DECLARATION OF RICHARD MEAGLIA ; POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF FILED BY (WALKER, BARBARA) , (WALKER, JESSE) , (FUTCH, YVETTE) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2002
  • NOTICE OF MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT; , DECLARATION, AND POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF FILED. RECEIPT # SNI478057001 . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 07/26/02 AT 10:30A M, IN DIV. 003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2002
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN SNI439479009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2002
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2002
  • MATTER SET FOR STATUS CONFERENCE ON 07/30/02 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ATTORNEY AT LAW - RICHARD MEAGLIA