This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2016 at 06:55:19 (UTC).

W103 INVESTMENT CO. VS. GANT, DARRYLE J.

Case Summary

On 04/04/2005 W103 INVESTMENT CO filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GANT, DARRYLE J. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Culver City Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1217

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Culver City Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

W103 INVESTMENT CO.

Defendants

GANT DARRYLE J.

DOES 1 TO 5

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF MICHAEL J. MEADE - MICHAEL J. MEADE

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF MICHAEL J. MEADE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2011
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2011
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 02/03/11 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2005
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # PAID .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2005
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 29.83 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2005
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2005
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 04/22/05 , FOR (W103 INVESTMENT CO.) , AGAINST (GANT, DARRYLE J.) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 9718 GLASGOW PLACE #5, LOS ANGELES, CA 90045 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2005
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP; DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2005
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY CLERK FOR DEFAULT ENTERED OF (GANT, DARRYLE J.) ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS ON 04/21/05 FILED. DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 159.30 , AND DECLARATON OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2005
  • SUMMONS FILED WITH PROOF OF SERVICE THEREON AS TO (GANT, DARRYLE J.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2005
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (GANT, DARRYLE J.) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2005
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN SM00206001.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2005
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2005
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.