This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/05/2016 at 12:16:09 (UTC).

VORTEX INDUSTRIES, INC. VS. CALIFORNIA PRODUCTION GROUP IN

Case Summary

On 11/30/2001 VORTEX INDUSTRIES, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CALIFORNIA PRODUCTION GROUP IN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, East Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM STERLING, MARIO M. DELAROSA and WILLIAM N. STERLING. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3080

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East Los Angeles Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM STERLING

MARIO M. DELAROSA

WILLIAM N. STERLING

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VORTEX INDUSTRIES INC.

Defendant

CALIFORNIA PRODUCTION GROUP INC.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 05/16/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2002
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2002
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL DE NOVO ON APPEAL MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED. EXHIBITS INCLUDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2002
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 02:00P M, IN DIV. 184 , HON. WILLIAM N. STERLING PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL TRIAL DE NOVO. APPELLANT APPEARING ISRAEL GARCIA HERNANDEZ . RESPONDENT APPEARING. TRIAL DE NOVO HELD AND MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2002
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION AFTER APPEAL AND TRIAL DE NOVO ON 03/05/02 . FOR (VORTEX INDUSTRIES, INC.) . AGAINST (CALIFORNIA PRODUCTION GROUP INC.) . PRINCIPAL $ 1806.76 , COSTS $ 65.00 , ATTORNEY FEES $ .00 , AND SUPERIOR COURT COSTS $ .00 . TOTAL $ 1871.76 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2002
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 02:00P M, IN DIV. 184 , HON. WILLIAM STERLING PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL TRIAL DE NOVO: PLAINTIFF APPEARING BY ADMINISTRATIVE ASST. JESSICA MARTINEZ DEFENDANT BY ISRAEL HERNANDEZ. DEFENDANT REQUEST TO CONT. .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2002
  • MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL TRIAL DE NOVO TO 03/05/02 AT 02:00P M, IN DEPT. 184 . DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE IS GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2002
  • NOTICE OF SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL TRIAL DE NOVO FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 02/28/02 , AT 02:00P M, IN DIV./ DEPT. 184 OF THE EAST LOS ANGELES . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2002
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 09:25A M, IN DIV. 001 , HON. MARIO M. DELAROSA, JUDGE PRO TEM PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING REP. JESSICA MARTINEZ . DEFENDANT APPEARING REP. BOBBY OMRANY .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2002
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER APPOINTING TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2002
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 01/04/02 . FOR (VORTEX INDUSTRIES, INC.) . AGAINST (CALIFORNIA PRODUCTION GROUP INC.) . PRINCIPAL $ 1806.76 . COSTS $ 50.00 . TOTAL $ 1856.76 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS. JUDGMENT VACATED - SEE TRIAL DE NOVO JUDGMENT AS OF 3/7/02.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2002
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (CALIFORNIA PRODUCTION GROUP INC.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2001
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (CALIFORNIA PRODUCTION GROUP INC.) BY SUB-SERVING MARITZA CUEVAS . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 01/04/02 AT 08:45A M, IN DIV. 001 COSTS OF $ 30.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2001
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN CHECK. TENTATIVELY SET FOR HEARING ON 01/04/02 AT 08:45 AM IN DIV. 001.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.