Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/24/2016 at 06:39:39 (UTC).

VILLASENOR, SYLVIA VS. FELIKIAN, WILLIAM

Case Summary

On 09/17/2001 VILLASENOR, SYLVIA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against FELIKIAN, WILLIAM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, East Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID SOTELO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1141

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East Los Angeles Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID SOTELO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VILLASENOR SYLVIA

Defendants

FELIKIAN MARTIN

FELIKIAN TAMARA AMENDED

SANCHEZ CHARLES SUED HEREIN AS SANCHEZ EVARISTO L.

FELIKIAN WILLIAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATTORNEY AT LAW - WILLIAM ALAN SOBEL

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Defendant Attorney

COOPER KARDARAS & KELLEHER, LLP - BRUCE NEHLSEN ESQ

Attorney at COOPER KARDARAS & KELLEHER, LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 05/25/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2003
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2003
  • NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED BY (VILLASENOR, SYLVIA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2003
  • ORDER RE: APPOINTMENT OF MEDIATOR SIGNED AND FILED. ON 7/1/03 COURT TO APPOINT NEW MEDIATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2003
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DIVISION 007 FOR CONSIDERATION STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE MEDIATION COMPLETION DATE AND POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2003
  • NOTICE OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST/RECUSAL/INABILITY TO SERVE AS MEDIATOR RECEIVED AND FILED. NEW MEDIATOR TO BE APPOINTED 6/2/03

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2003
  • STIPULATION RE: AND ORDER TO CONTINUE MEDIATION COMPLETION DATE AND POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE FILED. BY DEFENDANTS, MARTIN FELIKIAN AND CHARLES FELIKIAN RECEIPT # 00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2003
  • NOTICE OF REGISTRATION TO MEDIATION COORDINATOR FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED. CUSTOMIZED FORM ISSUED & TITLED NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF MEDIATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2003
  • NOTICE OF REGISTRATION TO MEDIATION COORDINATOR FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED. CUSTOMIZED FORM ISSUED & TITLED NOTICE OF REAPPOINTMENT OF MEDIATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2002
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (FELIKIAN, MARTIN) . COSTS OF $ 40.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2002
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2002
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 10:00A M, IN DIV. CLK , HON. DAVID SOTELO PRESIDING FOR STATUS CONFERENCE. PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE IS GRANTED. MATTER CONTINUED TO 08/23/02 AT 09:00A M, IN DIV. CLK .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2002
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (FELIKIAN, WILLIAM) , (FELIKIAN, MARTIN) . COSTS OF $ 60.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2002
  • NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO APPEAR FILED AND MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 06/21/02 AT 10:00A M, IN DIV. CLK . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2001
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (FELIKIAN, MARTIN) . COSTS OF $ 35.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2001
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED AS TO (SANCHEZ, EVARISTO L.) , ONLY .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2001
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED INSERTING IN PLACE AND STEAD OF FICTITIOUS NAME DOE 1 THE TRUE NAME OF (FELIKIAN, TAMARA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2001
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN 235356017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2001
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less