This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2016 at 22:15:55 (UTC).

VERIZON CALIFORNIA VS. JENSEN ENTERPRISES, INC.

Case Summary

On 06/21/2005 VERIZON CALIFORNIA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JENSEN ENTERPRISES, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Malibu Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0110

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Malibu Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VERIZON CALIFORNIA A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

DARRELL ROY ENTERPRISES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

JENSEN ENTERPRISES INC. DBA JENSEN PRECAST A

DOUGLAS BILL LEO AKA DOUGLAS JR. WILLIAM L. AN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARK POLLICK APC - MARK POLLICK

Attorney at MARK POLLICK APC

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF LINDA M. LIBERTUCCI - TED R CRISLER

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF LINDA M. LIBERTUCCI

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2007
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2007
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 09/07/07 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2006
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2005
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (VERIZON CALIFORNIA) A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2005
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (JENSEN ENTERPRISES, INC.) DBA (JENSEN PRECAST) A NEVADA CORPORATION .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2005
  • SUMMONS FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2005
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (DARRELL ROY ENTERPRISES, INC.) A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET;CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM AND STATEMENT OF LOCATION FILED. SERVED AS TO (DARRELL ROY ENTERPRISES, INC.) A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION . COSTS OF $ 49.75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2005
  • ANSWER FILED OF (JENSEN ENTERPRISES, INC.) DBA (JENSEN PRECAST) A NEVADA CORPORATION . RECEIPT # MAL136401014 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW CASE ASSIGNMENT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM AND STATEMENT OF LOCATION FILED. SERVED AS TO (JENSEN ENTERPRISES, INC.) DBA (JENSEN PRECAST) A NEVADA CORPORATION AUTHORIZED AGENT FOR SERVICE; CT CORPORATION SYSTEM . COSTS OF $ 49.75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2005
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN MAL136401003.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2005
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2005
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 11/23/05 AT 10:00A M, IN DIV/DEPT. CLK . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 06/21/05

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2005
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.