This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/20/2017 at 07:35:41 (UTC).

VERGARA, DANIEL VS. GRAY, CHRISTOPHER

Case Summary

On 01/24/2013 VERGARA, DANIEL filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against GRAY, CHRISTOPHER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JULIUS M. TITLE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0174

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Beverly Hills Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JULIUS M. TITLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MORROW ERIC STEVE DBA MORROW & ASSOCIATES ASSIGNEE OF JUDGMENT

Defendant

GRAY CHRISTOPHER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATTORNEY AT LAW - LAURENCE H. LISHNER

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2013
  • APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT RECEIVED AND NEW CASE FILE OPENED. ALL PAPERS PREVIOUSLY FILED UNDER THIS CASE NUMBER ARE PLACED INTO THE NEW ASSIGNED CASE NUMBER 03U00174 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2013
  • APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED. TOTAL JUDGMENT RENEWED IN THE SUM OF $ 12832.13 . RECEIPT # 451225009 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2013
  • APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT HAVING BEEN FILED, ALL PAPERS PREVIOUSLY FILED UNDER CASE NUMBER 03U00174 ARE PLACED INTO THE CASE FILE UNDER THIS NUMBER. JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2013
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED, $ 6362.25 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2013
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 349.88 FILED BY (MORROW, ERIC STEVE), DBA (MORROW & ASSOCIATES), ASSIGNEE OF JUDGMENT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2013
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON THE APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT AS A FINAL DISPOSTION ON 01/24/13 , FOR (MORROW, ERIC STEVE), DBA (MORROW & ASSOCIATES), ASSIGNEE OF JUDGMENT , AGAINST (GRAY, CHRISTOPHER) , PRINCIPAL (LINE E) $ 6439.88 , INTEREST AFTER JUDGMENT (LINE F) $ 6362.25 , FEE FOR FILING RENEWAL (LINE G) $ 30.00 . TOTAL $ 12,832.13 . RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED W/SAME CASE #03U00174,JUDGMENT RENEWED ON 01/24/2013,,,OLD JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 03/21/2003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2013
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT STAYED UNTIL PROOF OF SERVICE IS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ORDER TO APPEAR FOR EXAMINATION .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2011
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED, $ 5195.69 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2011
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ON BEHALF OF (MORROW, ERIC STEVE), DBA (MORROW & ASSOCIATES), ASSIGNEE OF JUDGMENT , RECEIPT NO. BH053524021 .

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 03/21/2003
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 03/21/03 , FOR (VERGARA, DANIEL) , AGAINST (GRAY, CHRISTOPHER) , PAST DUE RENT + DAILY DAMAGES $ 5440.00 , ATTORNEY FEES $ 500.00 , COSTS $ 150.00 . TOTAL $ 6,090.00 , AND FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES LOCATED AT 7272 WILLOUGHBY AVE., LOS ANGELES, CA 90046 , AND THIS JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS OF THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46. NO FINAL LOCKOUT PRIOR TO 03/24/03;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2003
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE EXHIBITS/DEPOSITIONS ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2003
  • SUMMONS AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED. REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF ******** , AND AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP, DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP , MEMO OF COSTS, IN THE SUM OF $ 0.00 , AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2003
  • MATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL ON 03/21/03 AT 08:30A M., IN DIV. 006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2003
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2003
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2003
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2003
  • ANSWER FILED OF (GRAY, CHRISTOPHER) . RECEIPT # BH278865013 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2003
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN BH443576004.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2003
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less