This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2016 at 19:28:08 (UTC).

VELASQUEZ, PATRICK VS. SERRANO, CHRIS

Case Summary

On 03/22/2001 VELASQUEZ, PATRICK filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SERRANO, CHRIS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, East Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID SOTELO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0252

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East Los Angeles Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID SOTELO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VELASQUEZ PATRICK

Defendants

SERRANO CHRIS

SERRANO JULIE AKA VELASQUEZ JULIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATTORNEY-AT-LAW - JACK LEVY

Attorney at ATTORNEY-AT-LAW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 06/22/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2001
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 75.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2001
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. ORIGINALS TO ELA SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT . RECEIPT # ELA00215023 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2001
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 20.00 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2001
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE EXHIBITS/DEPOSITIONS ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2001
  • STIPULATION FOR COMMISSIONER TO ACT AS TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2001
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 09:00A M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. DAVID SOTELO, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. PLAINTIFF(S) APPEARING BY JACK LEVY . DEFENDANT(S) APPEARING BOTH PRO PER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2001
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 04/25/01 , FOR (VELASQUEZ, PATRICK) , AGAINST (SERRANO, CHRIS) , (SERRANO, JULIE) AKA (VELASQUEZ, JULIE) , PAST DUE RENT $ .00 , DAILY DAMAGES $ .00 , ATTORNEY FEES $ .00 , COSTS $ .00 . TOTAL $ .00 , AND FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES LOCATED AT 4619 E. SECOND STREET, LOS ANGELES, CA 90022 , AND THIS JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS OF THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2001
  • MATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL ON 04/25/01 AT 09:00A M., IN DIV. 003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2001
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2001
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP; DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2001
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2001
  • APPLICATION(S) FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY (SERRANO, CHRIS) , (SERRANO, JULIE) AKA (VELASQUEZ, JULIE) IS GRANTED. APPLICANT(S) MAY PROCEED IN THIS ACTION WITHOUT PAYMENT OF ANY COURT FEES OR COSTS LISTED IN RULE 985(I), CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2001
  • ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION(S) FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS OF (SERRANO, CHRIS) , (SERRANO, JULIE) AKA (VELASQUEZ, JULIE) SIGNED AND FILED. APPLICANT(S) PERMITTED TO PROCEED WITHOUT PAYMENT OF THE FOLLOWING COURT FEES AND COSTS: GENERAL DENIAL .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2001
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS AS TO (SERRANO, CHRIS) , (SERRANO, JULIE) AKA (VELASQUEZ, JULIE) , GENERAL DENIAL------DEFENDANTS IN PRO PER RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO DIV. 003 FOR CONSIDERATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2001
  • GENERAL DENIAL FILED OF (SERRANO, CHRIS) , (SERRANO, JULIE) AKA (VELASQUEZ, JULIE) . RECEIPT # WAIVER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2001
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2001
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN 135956007.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2001
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less