This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/20/2017 at 07:46:31 (UTC).

UNITED MERCHANTS ASSOCIATION VS. ROBERTS,LINDA L.

Case Summary

On 04/26/2012 UNITED MERCHANTS ASSOCIATION filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against ROBERTS,LINDA L. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0603

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Beverly Hills Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIVERSIFIED ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION DBA M. LEONARD & ASSOCIATES AS

Defendants

ROBERTS ERIC

ROBERTS LINDA L. AKA DAWSON LINDA L. AKA M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIX & ASSOCIATES, PLC - LLOYD DOUGLAS DIX ESQ

Attorney at DIX & ASSOCIATES, PLC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT RECEIVED AND NEW CASE FILE OPENED. ALL PAPERS PREVIOUSLY FILED UNDER THIS CASE NUMBER ARE PLACED INTO THE NEW ASSIGNED CASE NUMBER 02C00603 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT HAVING BEEN FILED, ALL PAPERS PREVIOUSLY FILED UNDER CASE NUMBER 02C00603 ARE PLACED INTO THE CASE FILE UNDER THIS NUMBER. JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED. TOTAL JUDGMENT RENEWED IN THE SUM OF $ 11273.03 . RECEIPT # 535247028 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2012
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED, $ 5262.43 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2012
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 695.00 FILED BY (DIVERSIFIED ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION) DBA (M. LEONARD & ASSOCIATES) ASSIGNEE OF JUDGMENT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2012
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF (DIVERSIFIED ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION) DBA (M. LEONARD & ASSOC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2012
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON THE APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT AS A FINAL DISPOSTION ON 04/26/12 , FOR (DIVERSIFIED ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION) DBA (M. LEONARD & ASSOCIATES) ASSIGNEE OF JUDGMENT , AGAINST (ROBERTS,LINDA L.) AKA (DAWSON, LINDA L.) AKA (MRS. ERIC ROBERTS) , (ROBERTS, ERIC) , PRINCIPAL (LINE E) $ 5980.60 , INTEREST AFTER JUDGMENT (LINE F) $ 5262.43 , FEE FOR FILING RENEWAL (LINE G) $ 30.00 . TOTAL $ 11,273.03 . RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED ON 04/26/12 W/SAME CASE #02C00603 JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 05/01/2002,,,JUDGMENT RENEWED ON 04/26/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2012
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT STAYED UNTIL PROOF OF SERVICE IS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2011
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY WHOLLY UNSATISFIED. COSTS $ 30.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2010
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ON BEHALF OF (DIVERSIFIED ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION) DBA (M. LEONARD & ASSOCIATES) ASSIGNEE OF JUDGMENT , RECEIPT NO. BH028535010 .

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2002
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT AND NOTICE OF RENEWAL FILED. SERVED AS TO (ROBERTS,LINDA L.) AKA (DAWSON, LINDA L.) AKA (MRS. ERIC ROBERTS) . COSTS OF $ 0.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2002
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT AND NOTICE OF RENEWAL FILED. SERVED AS TO (ROBERTS, ERIC) . COSTS OF $ 0.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2002
  • NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2002
  • APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED. TOTAL JUDGMENT RENEWED IN THE SUM O 5285.60. RN 459034010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2002
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED FOR PLAINTIFF (UNITED MERCHANTS ASSOCIATION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2002
  • APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT HAVING BEEN FILED, ALL PAPERS PREVIOUSLY FILED UNDER CASE NUMBER 92C01648 ARE PLACED INTO THE CASE FILE UNDER THIS NUMBER. JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2002
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED, $ 2560.40 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2002
  • PARTIAL SATISFACTION FILED IN THE AMOUNT OF $ 135.77 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2002
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 05/01/02 . FOR (UNITED MERCHANTS ASSOCIATION) . AGAINST (ROBERTS,LINDA L.) AKA (DAWSON, LINDA L.) AKA (MRS. ERIC ROBERTS) , (ROBERTS, ERIC) . PRINCIPAL $ 2702.20 . ATTY. FEES $ 0.00 . INTEREST $ 2560.40 . COSTS $ 23.00 . TOTAL $ 5,285.60 . RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT OLD CASE #92C01648, JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 10/30/92, NEW JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 05/01/02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2002
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less