This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/20/2017 at 07:51:22 (UTC).

UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS, VS. YORK, TERRY II

Case Summary

On 09/04/2012 UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against YORK, TERRY II. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1316

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Beverly Hills Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS A NEW YORK PARTNERSHIP

Defendant

YORK TERRY II

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF KENNETH J. MIELE - KENNETH J. MIELE

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF KENNETH J. MIELE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2012
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED AS TO (YORK, TERRY II) . DATE OF SERVICE WAS ON 12/14/12 . NO ENFORCEABLE EXECUTION TO ISSUE PRIOR TO 01/14/13 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT RECEIVED AND NEW CASE FILE OPENED. ALL PAPERS PREVIOUSLY FILED UNDER THIS CASE NUMBER ARE PLACED INTO THE NEW ASSIGNED CASE NUMBER 04C01316 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT HAVING BEEN FILED, ALL PAPERS PREVIOUSLY FILED UNDER CASE NUMBER 04C01316 ARE PLACED INTO THE CASE FILE UNDER THIS NUMBER. JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED. TOTAL JUDGMENT RENEWED IN THE SUM OF $ 25611.35 . RECEIPT # 535206029 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2012
  • PARTIAL SATISFACTION FILED IN THE AMOUNT OF $ 2036.79 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2012
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED, $ 11455.77 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2012
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 100.00 FILED BY (UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS,) A NEW YORK PARTNERSHIP .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2012
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON THE APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT AS A FINAL DISPOSTION ON 09/04/12 , FOR (UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS,) A NEW YORK PARTNERSHIP , AGAINST (YORK, TERRY II) , PRINCIPAL (LINE E) $ 14125.58 , INTEREST AFTER JUDGMENT (LINE F) $ 11455.77 , FEE FOR FILING RENEWAL (LINE G) $ 30.00 . TOTAL $ 25,611.35 . RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED ON 09/04/12 W/SAME CASE #04C01316 JUDGMENT RENEWED,,OLD JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 11/16/04

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2012
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT STAYED UNTIL PROOF OF SERVICE IS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2009
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY WHOLLY UNSATISFIED. COSTS $ 00.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 10/05/2004
  • SUMMONS FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2004
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (YORK, TERRY II) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2004
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY COURT FOR DEFAULT ENTERED OF (YORK, TERRY II) ON 10/05/04 FILED. DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 350.50 , AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2004
  • DECLARATION RE: NO ORIGINAL AGREEMENT AND IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2004
  • DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2004
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AS TO DOES / ROES 1 THROUGH 5 , [INCLUSIVE] ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2004
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, NOTICE CASE MGMT REVIEW/TO LITIGANTS, ADR PACKAGE, DECLARATION RE DILIGENCE FILED. SERVED AS TO (YORK, TERRY II) . COSTS OF $ 50.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2004
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN BH246938011.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2004
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2004
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 01/10/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV/DEPT. 006 . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 08/09/04

    Read MoreRead Less