This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/20/2017 at 07:51:20 (UTC).

UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS, VS. PHILLIPS, DONALD D.

Case Summary

On 08/01/2012 UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against PHILLIPS, DONALD D. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD A. STONE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1315

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Beverly Hills Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD A. STONE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS A NEW YORK PARTNERSHIP

Defendant

PHILLIPS DONALD D. AKA PHILLIPS DONALD D. JR.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF KENNETH J. MIELE - KENNETH J. MIELE

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF KENNETH J. MIELE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT RECEIVED AND NEW CASE FILE OPENED. ALL PAPERS PREVIOUSLY FILED UNDER THIS CASE NUMBER ARE PLACED INTO THE NEW ASSIGNED CASE NUMBER 04C01315 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED. TOTAL JUDGMENT RENEWED IN THE SUM OF $ 2761.99 . RECEIPT # 535206003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2012
  • PARTIAL SATISFACTION FILED IN THE AMOUNT OF $ 7700.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2012
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED, $ 1174.39 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2012
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON THE APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT AS A FINAL DISPOSTION ON 08/01/12 , FOR (UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS,) A NEW YORK PARTNERSHIP , AGAINST (PHILLIPS, DONALD D.) AKA (PHILLIPS, DONALD D. JR.) , PRINCIPAL (LINE E) $ 1557.60 , INTEREST AFTER JUDGMENT (LINE F) $ 1174.39 , FEE FOR FILING RENEWAL (LINE G) $ 30.00 . TOTAL $ 2,761.99 . RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED ON 08/01/12 W/SAME CASE #04C01315 JUDGMENT RENEWED,,,OLD JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 12/15/2004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2012
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT STAYED UNTIL PROOF OF SERVICE IS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2007
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY WHOLLY UNSATISFIED. COSTS $ 30.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2006
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ON BEHALF OF (UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS,) A NEW YORK PARTNERSHIP , RECEIPT NO. 278865040 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2006
  • PARTIAL SATISFACTION FILED IN THE AMOUNT OF $ 200.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2006
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED, $ 1294.10 .

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 12/15/2004
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY CLERK FOR DEFAULT ENTERED OF (PHILLIPS, DONALD D.) AKA (PHILLIPS, DONALD D. JR.) ON 12/15/04 FILED. DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 198.30 , AND DECLARATON OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2004
  • DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2004
  • DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES,INTEREST AND COSTS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2004
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 12/15/04 . FOR (UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS,) A NEW YORK PARTNERSHIP . AGAINST (PHILLIPS, DONALD D.) AKA (PHILLIPS, DONALD D. JR.) . PRINCIPAL $ 6750.83 . ATTORNEY FEES $ 495.00 . INTEREST $ 1813.47 . COSTS $ 198.30 . TOTAL $ 9,257.60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2004
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AS TO DOES / ROES 1 THROUGH 5 , [INCLUSIVE] ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2004
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS,) A NEW YORK PARTNERSHIP .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2004
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, NOTICE CASE MGMT REVIEW, ADR PACKAGE, FILED. SERVED AS TO (PHILLIPS, DONALD D.) AKA (PHILLIPS, DONALD D. JR.) . COSTS OF $ 45.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2004
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN BH246938013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2004
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2004
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 01/10/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV/DEPT. 006 . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 08/09/04

    Read MoreRead Less