This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2016 at 07:00:57 (UTC).

UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS VS. LARSON, ELIZABETH J.

Case Summary

On 05/05/2005 UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LARSON, ELIZABETH J. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Culver City Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1261

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Culver City Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS

Defendant

LARSON ELIZABETH J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF BRACHFELD & ASSOCIATES - ERICA L. BRACHFELD

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF BRACHFELD & ASSOCIATES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2007
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2007
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 05/30/07 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2007
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS) FOR REJECTION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL. DISMISSAL ENTERED 3/8/06. SUBMITTED ON 03/09/07

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2006
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2006
  • COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2006
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO WEF RE: HEARING OF 03/08/06 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2006
  • MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO 03/08/06 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. WEF .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2006
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2006
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO WEF RE: HEARING OF 02/09/06 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2006
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS) .

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/28/2005
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO NANCI K. IN DEPT. F RE: STATUS CONFERENCE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2005
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS) FOR REJECTION OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/ COURT JUDGMENT THERE IS NO DECLARATION ATTACHED TO YOUR ORDER RE: LOST ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS SUBMITTED ON 09/12/05

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2005
  • SUMMONS FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2005
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AS TO DOES / ROES 1 THROUGH 100 , [INCLUSIVE] ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2005
  • DECLARATION RE: SEC. 1033 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2005
  • DECLARATION RE: WAIVER OF EXCESS INTEREST FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (LARSON, ELIZABETH J.) . COSTS OF $ 49.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2005
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN SM500645012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2005
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2005
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 10/05/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV/DEPT. CLK . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 05/05/05

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.