Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/24/2016 at 04:13:36 (UTC).

TRIEU, XIA CAIXIAN VS. RAY, MAKHAN GOPAL

Case Summary

On 12/20/2001 TRIEU, XIA CAIXIAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RAY, MAKHAN GOPAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Monrovia Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1029

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Monrovia Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRIEU XIA CAIXIAN

Defendant

RAY MAKHAN GOPAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF MICHAEL S. YU - MICHAEL S. YU

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF MICHAEL S. YU

Defendant Attorney

SILVA, CLASEN & RAFFALOW - DAVID M. HILLIER

Attorney at SILVA, CLASEN & RAFFALOW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2003
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2002
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2002
  • NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 06/06/02 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 003 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2002
  • COUNTER MEMORANDUM TO SET CASE FOR JURY TRIAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2002
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR JURY TRIAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2002
  • NEXT ACTION DUE 03/12/02 AT 09:00A M, IN DIV. KLM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2002
  • ANSWER FILED OF (RAY, MAKHAN GOPAL) . RECEIPT # SNI439479004 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2002
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY (RAY, MAKHAN GOPAL) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2002
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (RAY, MAKHAN GOPAL) . COSTS OF $ 38.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2001
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN SNI478057009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2001
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2001
  • MATTER SET FOR STATUS CONFERENCE ON 03/22/02 AT 10:30A M, IN DIV. 003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HILLIER DAVID M. ESQ.