This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2016 at 06:53:26 (UTC).

TORINO, BRETT VS. KARIMI, GHOLAM R.

Case Summary

On 03/22/2005 TORINO, BRETT filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KARIMI, GHOLAM R. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Culver City Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1204

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Culver City Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TORINO BRETT AN INDIVIDUAL

Defendant

KARIMI GHOLAM R. INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA AMERICAN LIMOUSINE SERVICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FIELDS & ISRAEL LLP - GARY D. FIELDS ESQ

Attorney at FIELDS & ISRAEL LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2011
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2011
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 02/03/11 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2006
  • COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2006
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2006
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO WEF RE: HEARING OF 10/23/06 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2006
  • NOTICE OF HEARING RE: OSC WHY SANCTIONS OR A DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH DELAY REDUCTION STANDARDS . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SIGNED AND FILED. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 10/23/06 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. WEF . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2005
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (TORINO, BRETT) AN INDIVIDUAL FOR REJECTION OF COURT JUDGMENT. THE DECLARATION PER C.C.P. SECTION 585 WAS NOT PROPERLY EXECUTED. THE DECLARATION, DOES NOT NOTE THE DATE IT WAS SIGNED. SUBMITTED ON 12/08/05

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2005
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY COURT FOR DEFAULT ENTERED OF (KARIMI, GHOLAM R.) INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA (AMERICAN LIMOUSINE SERVICE) ON 05/19/05 FILED. DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 215.30 , AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2005
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (TORINO, BRETT) AN INDIVIDUAL FOR REJECTION OF PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT IS BEING RETURNED. THIS MATTER WAS REVIEWED BY THE COURT AND REJECTED. ATTACHED IS THE NOTICE OF REJECTION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT. PLEASE COMPLY WITH THE HIGHLIGHTED AREAS. SUBMITTED ON 08/25/05

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2005
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2005
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED AS TO DOES / ROES 1 THROUGH 50 , [INCLUSIVE] ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2005
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (TORINO, BRETT) AN INDIVIDUAL FOR REJECTION OF CLERK'S JUDGMENT. PLEASE PROVIDE THE CLERK WITH THE FOLLOWING DOCUMENTS: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO DOES; A DECLARATION AND DOCUMENTS WHICH STATES HOW THE DEFENDANT INCURRED THIS DEBT. SUBMITTED ON 07/28/05

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2005
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (TORINO, BRETT) AN INDIVIDUAL .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2005
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY CLERK FOR DEFAULT ENTERED OF (KARIMI, GHOLAM R.) INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA (AMERICAN LIMOUSINE SERVICE) ON 05/19/05 FILED. DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 215.30 , AND DECLARATON OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2005
  • SUMMONS FILED. REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (KARIMI, GHOLAM R.) INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA (AMERICAN LIMOUSINE SERVICE) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP; DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (KARIMI, GHOLAM R.) INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA (AMERICAN LIMOUSINE SERVICE) . COSTS OF $ 0.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2005
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN SM500206010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2005
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2005
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 05/23/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. WEQ .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2005
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 08/09/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV/DEPT. WEQ . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 03/22/05

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.