This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/04/2016 at 05:44:39 (UTC).

TO, MINH VS. VENDING PLUS INC.

Case Summary

On 07/06/2001 TO, MINH filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against VENDING PLUS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, East Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL J.T. OBRIEN and MICHAEL J. O'BRIEN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1635

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East Los Angeles Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL J.T. OBRIEN

MICHAEL J. O'BRIEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TO MINH

Defendants

DOUGLAS KIRK

VENDING PLUS INC.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2011
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2011
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 12/30/11 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2001
  • ORDER FOR APPEARANCE OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR (VENDING PLUS INC.) RESET FOR 02/04/02 , AT 02:00P M, IN DIV. 001 . RECEIPT # PAID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2001
  • ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION RE: SMALL CLAIMS ISSUED AS TO JUDGMENT DEBTOR (VENDING PLUS INC.) . MATTER TENTATIVELY SET FOR HEARING ON 12/06/01 AT 02:00P M., IN DIV. 001 . RECEIPT # ELA135956021 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2001
  • ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION ISSUED . RECEIPT # CASH .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2001
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. ORIGINIAL GIVEN TO THE PLAINTIFF . RECEIPT # CREDIT CARD .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2001
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (VENDING PLUS INC.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2001
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 09:00A M, IN DIV. 001 , HON. MICHAEL J. O'BRIEN JUDGE PRO TEM PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION, COURT ORDERS THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT SEE NEXT EVENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2001
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 09/17/01 . FOR (TO, MINH) . AGAINST (VENDING PLUS INC.) . PRINCIPAL $ 800.00 . COSTS $ 50.00 . TOTAL $ 850.00 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS. UNDER THE ASSUMPTION THAT INFORMATION GIVEN TO COURT THAT MACHINES HAVE BEEN DELIVERED. COURT REQUESTS, EITHER SIDE TO SEND LETTER TO COURT THAT MACHINES WERE DELIVERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2001
  • LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE RE: RESPONSE/ REQUESTED BY JUDGE, PRO TEM RECEIVED FROM (TO, MINH) AND PLACED INTO CASE FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2001
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2001
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 10:39A M, IN DIV. 001 , HON. MICHAEL J.T. OBRIEN, JUDGE PRO TEM PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . DEFENDANT APPEARING ADEMOLA ADETOYE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2001
  • THURA NUVE SWORN AS WITNESS{ES} FOR PLAINTIFF, MINH TO .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2001
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER APPOINTING TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2001
  • MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON 08/27/01 AT 08:45A M, IN DIV. 001 . BOTH SIDES TO SUBMIT LETTERS BY THIS DATE. COURT WILL THEN SUBMIT, AND NOTIFY BOTH SIDES OF DECISION. RECEIPT # FEE WAIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2001
  • COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO (DOUGLAS, KIRK) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2001
  • FAULTY PROOF OF SERVICE RE: PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED AS TO (VENDING PLUS INC.) . DOES NOT SPECIFY WHO IT WAS DELIVERED TO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2001
  • AMENDMENT TO CLAIM OF (TO, MINH) FILED ADDED A NEW DEFENDANT ,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2001
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # CASH . TENTATIVELY SET FOR HEARING ON 08/10/01 AT 08:45A M, IN DIV. 001

    Read MoreRead Less