This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2016 at 06:53:02 (UTC).

THE SIMON GROUP VS. HUFFINGTON, ARIANNA

Case Summary

On 03/25/2005 THE SIMON GROUP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HUFFINGTON, ARIANNA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Culver City Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN H. REID. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1201

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Culver City Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN H. REID

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE SIMON GROUP A POLITICAL REPORTING TREASURY SERVICES A CO

Defendants

HUFFINGTON ARIANNA FOR GOVERNOR A CAMPAIGN COMMITTEE

HUFFINGTON ARIANNA AN INDIVIDUAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PORTNER LAW OFFICES - MICHAEL G. PORTNER

Attorney at PORTNER LAW OFFICES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2006
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2006
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 08/22/06 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2005
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2005
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO WEF RE: HEARING OF 05/23/05 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2005
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. WEF , HON. JOHN H. REID PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PROOF OF SERVICE . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS DISCHARGED. MATTER IS PLACED OFF CALENDAR. PROOF OF SERVICE FILED 05-12-05

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2005
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2005
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO WEF RE: HEARING OF 05/23/05 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2005
  • SUMMONS FILED WITH PROOF OF SERVICE THEREON AS TO (HUFFINGTON, ARIANNA) FOR GOVERNOR, A CAMPAIGN COMMITTEE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2005
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN SM500206007.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2005
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2005
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 05/23/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. WEQ .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2005
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 08/09/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV/DEPT. WEQ . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 03/25/05

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.