This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/20/2016 at 04:24:15 (UTC).

The Housing Authority Vs. Parker, Michelle

Case Summary

On 03/12/2001 a Property - Residential Eviction case was filed by The Housing Authority against Parker Michelle in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5690

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Housing Authority

Defendant

Parker Michelle

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2003
  • CASE DESTROYED PER GC 68152 & 68153

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2001
  • HEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2001
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE-ENTIRE ACTION, FILED & ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2001
  • OSC SET 04/19/01, 0830 AM, DIV/DEPT 8B, RM 732, NOTICE FILED & MAIL * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2001
  • OSC SET 04/19/01, 0830 AM, DIV/DEPT 8B, RM 426, NOTICE FILED & MAIL * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2001
  • A/C ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2001
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.