This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/20/2017 at 07:46:59 (UTC).

THE EDUCATION RESOURCES INSTIT VS. FOGEL, TORRE

Case Summary

On 02/06/2013 THE EDUCATION RESOURCES INSTIT filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against FOGEL, TORRE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2484

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Beverly Hills Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE EDUCATION RESOURCES INSTITUTE INC

Defendant

FOGEL TORRE AN INDIVIDUAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF GARY A BEMIS - BEMIS, GARY A

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF GARY A BEMIS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2013
  • APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT HAVING BEEN FILED, ALL PAPERS PREVIOUSLY FILED UNDER CASE NUMBER 02C02484 ARE PLACED INTO THE CASE FILE UNDER THIS NUMBER. JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2013
  • APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED. TOTAL JUDGMENT RENEWED IN THE SUM OF $ 44620.62 . RECEIPT # 278865017 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2013
  • APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT RECEIVED AND NEW CASE FILE OPENED. ALL PAPERS PREVIOUSLY FILED UNDER THIS CASE NUMBER ARE PLACED INTO THE NEW ASSIGNED CASE NUMBER 02C02484 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2013
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED, $ 22190.60 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2013
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 25.00 FILED BY (THE EDUCATION RESOURCES INSTITUTE, INC ) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2013
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON THE APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT AS A FINAL DISPOSTION ON 02/06/13 , FOR (THE EDUCATION RESOURCES INSTITUTE, INC ) , AGAINST (FOGEL, TORRE) AN INDIVIDUAL , PRINCIPAL (LINE E) $ 22400.02 , INTEREST AFTER JUDGMENT (LINE F) $ 22190.60 , FEE FOR FILING RENEWAL (LINE G) $ 30.00 . TOTAL $ 44,620.62 . RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED ON 02/06/2013 W/SAME CASE # 02C02484 JUDGMENT RENEWED,,,OLD JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 03/10/2003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2013
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT STAYED UNTIL PROOF OF SERVICE IS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2012
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ON BEHALF OF (THE EDUCATION RESOURCES INSTITUTE, INC ) , RECEIPT NO. 278865031 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2012
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED FOR PLAINTIFF (THE EDUCATION RESOURCES INSTITUTE, INC )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2005
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF (THE EDUCATION RESOURCES INSTITUTE, INC ) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2003
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF 3/D01 . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP; DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2003
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY COURT FOR DEFAULT ENTERED OF (FOGEL, TORRE) AN INDIVIDUAL ON 02/10/03 FILED. DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 143.00 , AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2003
  • DECLARATION RE: SEC. 585(D) CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2003
  • DECLARATION RE: OF AMY E. BRITT IN SUPPORT OF CALACULATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2003
  • DECLARATION RE: AND EX-PARTE APPLICATIONFOR AN ORDER PERMITTING THE USE OF COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS IN OBTAINING DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2003
  • SUMMONS FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2003
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED AS TO (FOGEL, TORRE) AN INDIVIDUAL .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2002
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN BH277728005.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2002
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2002
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 05/09/03 AT 10:00A M, IN DIV/DEPT. WBH . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 12/10/02

    Read MoreRead Less