This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/16/2016 at 12:10:34 (UTC).

The City Of Los Angeles Vs Pants R Us

Case Summary

On 03/12/2001 a Contract - Debt Collection case was filed by The City Of Los Angeles against Pants R Us in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4560

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The City Of Los Angeles

Defendant

Pants R Us

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2011
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED, RETURNED BY MAIL/GSV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2011
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST MAIL NTC OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2011
  • A/C - ATTORNEY UPDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2011
  • NO CASE ACTION ON FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2011
  • FEE WAIVER ENTERED - GC 6103

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2001
  • STATUS CONFERENCE HELD, MINUTE ORDER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2001
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT FILED AND ISSUED/DG/MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2001
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2001
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2001
  • PREVIOUSLY ENTERED DEFAULT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2001
  • OSC CONTINUED TO 09/25/01 AT 08:30 AM IN DIV 8B, ROOM 426

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2001
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT ONLY PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2001
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT ONLY PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2001
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2001
  • OSC CONTINUED TO 08/08/01 AT 08:30 AM IN DIV 8B, ROOM 426

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2001
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS AND PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2001
  • CERTIFICATE OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2001
  • OSC SET 07/09/01, 0830 AM, DIV/DEPT 8B, RM 426, NOTICE FILED & MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.