This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/25/2021 at 15:13:09 (UTC).

SYSCO FOOD SERVICES OF LOS ANG VS. RIBET ACADEMY EDUCATIONAL ENRI

Case Summary

On 04/03/2001 SYSCO FOOD SERVICES OF LOS ANG filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RIBET ACADEMY EDUCATIONAL ENRI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse North located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0693

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse North

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYSCO FOOD SERVICES OF LOS ANGELES INC. A CORPORATION

Defendants

SIROS RONALD L.AKA SIRES RONALD L.AKA SIROS RONALDAKA SIROS RON AN IN

RIBET ACADEMY EDUCATIONAL ENRICHMENT FUND INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AK

HEYMANN GERD AKA HEYMANN G.E.AKA HEYMANN GERD E. AN INDIVIDUAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF HEMAR, ROUSSO & HEALD LLP - MARTINA A. RIDER

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF HEMAR, ROUSSO & HEALD LLP

Defendant Attorney

RIBET ACADEMY - RONALD L. SIRES

Attorney at RIBET ACADEMY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2008
  • DocketCASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2008
  • DocketPURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON10/23/08 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2002
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2002
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TOALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2001
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO CANDIE RE: CORR DESK .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2001
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2001
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2001
  • DocketNOTICE RE: STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT FILED .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2001
  • DocketCOURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. PERUNIFORM RULE 4.11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2001
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2001
  • DocketANSWER FILED OF (RIBET ACADEMY EDUCATIONAL ENRICHMENTFUND, INC.) A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AKA (RIBET ACADEMY). RECEIPT # POM234074022 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2001
  • DocketANSWER FILED OF (SIROS,RONALD L.)AKA (SIRES, RONALD L.)AKA (SIROS, RONALD)AKA (SIROS, RON) AN INDIVIDUAL .RECEIPT # POM234074023 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2001
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2001
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO PATTY RE: PROOF OF SERVICE .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2001
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, STATUSCONFERENCE, DELAY REDUCTION RULES STATUS CONFERENCEQUESTIONNAIRE FILED. SERVED AS TO (RIBET ACADEMYEDUCATIONAL ENRICHMENT FUND, INC.) A CALIFORNIACORPORATION AKA (RIBET ACADEMY) , (SIROS,RONALD L.)AKA(SIRES, RONALD L.) AKA (SIROS, RONALD)AKA (SIROS, RON) ANINDIVIDUAL , (HEYMANN, GERD) AKA (HEYMANN, G.E.)AKA(HEYMANN, GERD E.) AN INDIVIDUAL . COSTS OF $ 98.34 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2001
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2001
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED. RN POM234074007.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2001
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2001
  • DocketNOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO APPEAR FILED ANDMAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. MATTER SET FORHEARING ON 08/01/01 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 004 .CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RIBET EDUCATION FUND INC is a litigant

Latest cases where SYSCO FOOD SERVICES OF LOS ANGELES INC. A SUBSIDIARY OF SYSCO CORP. is a litigant