This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2016 at 04:38:16 (UTC).

SWISS AMERICAN JEWELERS INCORP VS. ROSALES, CLAUDIA

Case Summary

On 10/18/2000 SWISS AMERICAN JEWELERS INCORP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ROSALES, CLAUDIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, East Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TONY LUNA. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2353

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2000

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TONY LUNA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SWISS AMERICAN JEWELERS INCORP

Defendant

ROSALES CLAUDIA AKA CLAUDIA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 05/04/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2001
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY WHOLLY UNSATISFIED. COSTS $ 25.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2001
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED. BY PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2001
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT IN THE AMOUNT OF $ 150.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2001
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED, $ 9.38 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2001
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. . RECEIPT # CHECK .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2000
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (ROSALES, CLAUDIA) AKA CLAUDIA .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2000
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 10:37A M, IN DIV. 001 , HON. TONY LUNA PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING BY MARIO BERNY . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2000
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER APPOINTING TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2000
  • DECLARATION RE: NON-MILITARY SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2000
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 11/28/00 . FOR (SWISS AMERICAN JEWELERS INCORP) . AGAINST (ROSALES, CLAUDIA) AKA CLAUDIA . PRINCIPAL $ 440.50 . COSTS $ 63.00 . TOTAL $ 503.50 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2000
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (ROSALES, CLAUDIA) AKA CLAUDIA . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 11/28/00 AT 08:45A M, IN DIV. 001 . COSTS OF $ 28.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2000
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN CHECK. TENTATIVELY SET FOR HEARING ON 11/28/00 AT 08:45 AM IN DIV. 001.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SWISS AMERICAN JEWELERS INC is a litigant