This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/20/2016 at 17:26:54 (UTC).

SWISS AMERICAN JEWELERS INCORP VS. RIVERA, DOMINIC JR.

Case Summary

On 01/04/2000 SWISS AMERICAN JEWELERS INCORP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RIVERA, DOMINIC JR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, East Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BEN MARGOLIS and TONY LUNA. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0010

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2000

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BEN MARGOLIS

TONY LUNA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SWISS AMERICAN JEWELERS INCORP

Defendant

RIVERA DOMINIC JR.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 03/14/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2001
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2001
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY WHOLLY SATISFIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2001
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. $669.16 . RECEIPT # CHECK .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2001
  • BENCH WARRANT RECALLED. COURT ORDERS BENCH WARRANT RECALLED AT PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2001
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED, $ 67.16 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2001
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 40.00 FILED. ALLOWED ON OR AFTER 03/23/01 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2000
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 02:06P M, IN DIV. 001 , HON. BEN MARGOLIS, JUDGE PRO TEM. PRESIDING FOR EXAM. OF JGMT DEBTOR. JGMT CREDITOR APPEARING BY ROSIO ACOSTA . JUDGMENT DEBTOR (RIVERA, DOMINIC JR.) FAILING TO APPEAR. BENCH WARRANT ORDERED ISSUED IN THE AMOUNT OF $5,000.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2000
  • ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED. MATTER SET ON 04/14/00 AT 02:00P M, IN DIV. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2000
  • ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION ISSUED 041400 . RN CHECK .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2000
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 09:16A M, IN DIV. 001 , HON. TONY LUNA PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING BY ROSIO ACOSTA . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2000
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER APPOINTING TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2000
  • DECLARATION RE: NON-MILITARY SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2000
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 02/04/00 . FOR (SWISS AMERICAN JEWELERS INCORP) . AGAINST (RIVERA, DOMINIC JR.) . DAMAGES $ 494.00 . COSTS $ 61.00 . TOTAL $ 555.00 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2000
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (RIVERA, DOMINIC JR.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2000
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (RIVERA, DOMINIC JR.) BY SUB-SERVING GABRIELA RIVERA . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 02/04/00 AT 08:45A M, IN DIV. 001 COSTS OF $ 26.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2000
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN 235366005. TENTATIVELY SET FOR HEARING ON 02/04/00 AT 08:45 AM IN DIV. 001.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SWISS AMERICAN JEWELERS INC is a litigant