This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/31/2016 at 08:34:48 (UTC).

STUS, WALENTINA VS. CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Case Summary

On 09/02/2003 STUS, WALENTINA filed an Other lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Culver City Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOSEPH S. BIDERMAN and JOE W. HILBERMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3433

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOSEPH S. BIDERMAN

JOE W. HILBERMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STUS WALENTINA

Defendant

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF LOUIS MAGUR - LOUIS MAGUR

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF LOUIS MAGUR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 04/03/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2004
  • ORDER RE: DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT SIGNED BY JOSEPH S. BIDERMAN AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2004
  • COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 581(F)(1)AS TO ALL CAUSES OF ACTION AGAINST DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2004
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2004
  • NOTICE RE: TRANSMITTING THE PROPOSED ORDER TO THE COURT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2004
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 , HON. JOSEPH S. BIDERMAN PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: DEMURRER TO COMPLIANT: . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: THE REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IS GRANTED AS CITY'S EXHIBIT C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2004
  • THE DEMURRER FILED BY CITY OF LOS ANGELES NOTICE OF RULING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2004
  • OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF FILED BY (STUS, WALENTINA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2004
  • REQUEST RE: JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF THE SUPPLEMENTAL POINTS AND AUTHORITIES TO THE DEMURRER BY CITY OF LOS ANGELES RECEIVED AND FILED. MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2003
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2003
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2003
  • COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. THERE BEING NO APPEARANCES THIS DATE, THE CASE IS DISMISSED. CLERK TO GIVE NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2003
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 , HON. JOE W. HILBERMAN, JUDGE PRESIDING FOR STATUS CONFERENCE. PLAINTIFF APPEARING BY LOUIS MAGUR, ESQ . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT(S). THE MATTER IS CONTINUED TO 12-17-03 AT 8:30AM IN DIV 1. PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2003
  • MATTER SET FOR STATUS CONFERENCE ON 12/17/03 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2003
  • SUMMONS FILED WITH PROOF OF SERVICE THEREON AS TO (CITY OF LOS ANGELES) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2003
  • RECEIPT FOR RECORD OF TRANSFER FILED. NEW CASE NUMBER 03A03433 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2003
  • NOTICE OF RECEIPT ON TRANSFER CASE MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2003
  • MATTER SET FOR STATUS CONFERENCE ON 10/16/03 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2003
  • DOCUMENTS RECEIVED AND FILED ON RECLASSIFIED CASE FROM THE SANTA MONICA SUPERIOR COURTHOUSE OF THE LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, BEARING CASE# SC076636.

    Read MoreRead Less