This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/20/2017 at 07:50:50 (UTC).

STATE OF CLAIFORNIA EMPLOYMENT VS. BEAULIEU, DENISE A.

Case Summary

On 04/02/2012 STATE OF CLAIFORNIA EMPLOYMENT filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against BEAULIEU, DENISE A. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1775

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Beverly Hills Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF CLAIFORNIA EMPLOYMENT DEVLOPMENT DEPARTMENT

Defendant

BEAULIEU DENISE A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2012
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED AS TO (BEAULIEU, DENISE A.) . DATE OF SERVICE WAS ON 04/10/12 . NO ENFORCEABLE EXECUTION TO ISSUE PRIOR TO 05/10/12 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT RECEIVED AND NEW CASE FILE OPENED. ALL PAPERS PREVIOUSLY FILED UNDER THIS CASE NUMBER ARE PLACED INTO THE NEW ASSIGNED CASE NUMBER 02C01775 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED. TOTAL JUDGMENT RENEWED IN THE SUM OF $ 5614.16 . RECEIPT # 6103.5 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2012
  • PARTIAL SATISFACTION FILED IN THE AMOUNT OF $ 818.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2012
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED, $ 2752.57 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2012
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON THE APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT AS A FINAL DISPOSTION ON 04/02/12 , FOR (STATE OF CLAIFORNIA EMPLOYMENT DEVLOPMENT DEPARTMENT) , AGAINST (BEAULIEU, DENISE A.) , PRINCIPAL (LINE E) $ 2831.59 , INTEREST AFTER JUDGMENT (LINE F) $ 2752.57 , FEE FOR FILING RENEWAL (LINE G) $ 30.00 . TOTAL $ 5,614.16 . RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED W/SAME CASE #02C01775,JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 09/19/2002,JUDGMENT RENEWED ON 04/02/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2012
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT STAYED UNTIL PROOF OF SERVICE IS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2004
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY WHOLLY UNSATISFIED. COSTS $ 25.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2003
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. . RECEIPT # 6103.5 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2003
  • PARTIAL SATISFACTION FILED IN THE AMOUNT OF $ 818.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2003
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED, $ 226.66 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2002
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. RECEIPT # GOVT 6103.5 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2002
  • CERTIFICATE/APPLICATION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED. RN 6103.5.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2002
  • SUMMARY JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS 091902 :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2002
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 09/19/02 . FOR (STATE OF CLAIFORNIA EMPLOYMENT DEVLOPMENT DEPARTMENT) . AGAINST (BEAULIEU, DENISE A.) . PRINCIPAL $ 3548.59 . ATTY. FEES $ 0.00 . INTEREST $ 0.00 . COSTS $ 101.00 . TOTAL $ 3,649.59 .

    Read MoreRead Less