This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/23/2016 at 14:50:39 (UTC).

State Of California, Employmen Vs. Rivera, Adam

Case Summary

On 03/12/2001 a Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery case was filed by State Of California Employmen against Rivera Adam in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, El Monte Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0513

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2001

  • Case Status:

    Undetermined

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    El Monte Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State Of California Employment Development Department Be

Defendant

Rivera Adam

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2013
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 03/12/13 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2006
  • FEE PAID. GOV'T CODE 6103.5, AMOUNT $ 99.00 . RECEIPT # ELM333333017 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2006
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2001
  • SUMMARY JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2001
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 03/30/01 . FOR (STATE OF CALIFORNIA, EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT) BENEFIT OVER PAYMENT COLLECTION SECTION MIC91 . AGAINST (RIVERA, ADAM) . PRINCIPAL $ 6056.92 . ATTY. FEES $ 0.00 . INTEREST $ 0.00 . COSTS $ 99.00 . TOTAL $ 6,155.92 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2001
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE EXHIBITS/DEPOSITIONS ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2001
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. MAILED TO RECORDER COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES . RECEIPT # 6103 GC .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2001
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DIVISION 001 FOR CONSIDERATION SUMMARY JUDGMENT PG .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • CERTIFICATE/APPLICATION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED. RN GOV.6103.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.