This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/17/2016 at 14:35:28 (UTC).

SNOW, WILLIAM DANIEL VS. VALLADARES, EDWIN ALBERTO

Case Summary

On 08/28/2000 SNOW, WILLIAM DANIEL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against VALLADARES, EDWIN ALBERTO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Monrovia Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. DUFFY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0704

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2000

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL J. DUFFY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SNOW WILLIAM DANIEL

SNOW SHAWNA

SNOW ARI A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HISGUARDIAN AD LITEM SNOW WILLIAM DA

Defendants

PINEDA LUIS ALFREDO

VALLADARES EDWIN ALBERTO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STONE, DOLGINER & WENZEL - CHARLES I. DOLGINER

Attorney at STONE, DOLGINER & WENZEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2003
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2001
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2001
  • STIPULATION FOR COMMISSIONER TO ACT AS TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2001
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. MICHAEL J. DUFFY, TEMPORARY JUDGE PRESIDING FOR STATUS CONFERENCE. PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONTINUE, DUE TO BINDING ARBITRATION. MOTION GRANTED. THE COURT ORDERS MATTER CONTINUED TO 08/29/01 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 003 . NOTICE WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2001
  • MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING RE: STATUS CONFERENCE TO 05/30/01 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2001
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • STATUS CONFERENCE QUESTIONNAIRE FILED. BY PLAINTIFF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2001
  • NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO APPEAR FILED AND MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 03/28/01 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 003 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2000
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN SNI258286008.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2000
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2000
  • PETITION AND APPOINTMENT OF (SNOW, WILLIAM DANIEL) GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR (SNOW, ARI) , RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO DIV. 004 FOR CONSIDERATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2000
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2000
  • PETITION AND APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR A MINOR FILED. ORDER APPOINTING (SNOW, WILLIAM DANIEL) FOR ARI SNOW SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2000
  • NEXT ACTION DUE 01/28/01 AT 09:00A M, IN DIV. KLM .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHARLES I. DOLGINER