This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/25/2016 at 16:24:37 (UTC).

Smith, Lorraine Vs. The Condo Managers

Case Summary

On 08/28/2000 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Smith Lorraine against The Condo Managers in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1315

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2000

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Robert Sainburg

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Fox Paul

Smith Lorraine

Smith Robert

Defendant

The Condo Managers

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

11/14/2012

PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 11/06/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/06/2012

CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/11/2000

CAUSE CALLED AT 09:00A M, IN DIV. NCF , HON. ROBERT SAINBURG PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL TRIAL DE NOVO. APPELLANT APPEARING . RESPONDENT APPEARING.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/11/2000

STIPULATION AND ORDER APPOINTING TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/11/2000

THE ONLY PURPOSE OF THIS ENTRY IS TO STAT THE PREVIOUS ENTERED FINAL DISPOSITION AFTER A TRIAL DE NOVO ON SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2000

NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED BY (THE CONDO MANAGERS) . RECEIPT # PAID . MATTER SET FOR HEARING RE: SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL TRIAL DE NOVO ON 12/11/00 AT 09:00A M, IN DIV. NCF OF THE SUPERIOR COURT . CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF APPEAL AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL TRIAL DE NOVO FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2000

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (THE CONDO MANAGERS) .

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2000

CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 00F , HON. ANDREW B. CERVIK PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . DEFENDANT APPEARING .

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2000

STIPULATION AND ORDER APPOINTING TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2000

DECLARATION RE: CCP 116.540 (THE CONDO MANAGERS) FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2000

JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 10/05/00 . FOR (SMITH, LORRAINE) , (FOX, PAUL) , (SMITH, ROBERT) . AGAINST (THE CONDO MANAGERS) . PRINCIPAL $ 3768.00 . COSTS $ 20.00 . TOTAL $ 3788.00 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2000

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (THE CONDO MANAGERS) BY SUB-SERVING HARLOTTE COURT . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 10/05/00 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 00F COSTS OF $ 0.00 .

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2000

PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN PAID. HEARING SET FOR 10/05/00 AT 08:30 AM IN DIV. 00F.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less