This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/10/2016 at 04:07:35 (UTC).

SIEGEL, JEFFREY VS. DAVIS, ELI

Case Summary

On 01/15/2004 SIEGEL, JEFFREY filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DAVIS, ELI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0049

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SIEGEL JEFFREY

Defendants

STURDIVANT JONATHAN

MOORE CAMERON

DAVIS ELI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZIFF, NORMAN D

Defendant Attorney

CALSADA, GLENN WARD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2004
  • DocketWRIT RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2004
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2004
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2004
  • DocketDEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2004
  • DocketDEFAULT PACKAGE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2004
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS TEMPORARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2004
  • DocketCOURT TRIAL CONCLUDED - JUDGMENT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2004
  • DocketFAILURE TO APPEAR JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2004
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2004
  • DocketDEFAULT PACKAGE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2004
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2004
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2004
  • DocketHEARING DATE SET FOR 02/18/04, 08:30 AM, DIV/DEPT 92

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2004
  • DocketMEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED-20 MIN(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2004
  • DocketRESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2004
  • DocketMEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED-30 MIN(S) * * REJECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2004
  • DocketMEMO TO SET REJECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2004
  • DocketRESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2004
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2004
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF NORMAN D. ZIFF - NORMAN D. ZIFF ESQ