Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2016 at 10:37:49 (UTC).

SHIN, JAE SEON VS. MITCHELL JR., JAY REGINALD

Case Summary

On 05/20/2004 SHIN, JAE SEON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MITCHELL JR , JAY REGINALD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Culver City Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN H. REID. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1527

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Culver City Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN H. REID

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHIN JAE SEON

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 20

MONTGOMERY MARKETING

MONTGOMERY ROBERT DBAMONTGOMERY MARKETING

MITCHELL JR. JAY REGINALD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF KEVIN N. DONNELLY - KEVIN N DONNELLY

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF KEVIN N. DONNELLY

Defendant Attorney

SILVA, CLASEN & RAFFALOW - EVE LICHTGARN

Attorney at SILVA, CLASEN & RAFFALOW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2007
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2007
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 01/04/07 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2005
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2005
  • NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED BY (SHIN, JAE SEON) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2005
  • JURY FEES POSTED BY SILVA CLASEN & RAFFALOW ON BEHALF OF (MITCHELL JR., JAY REGINALD) , IN THE AMOUNT OF $150.00, IN TRUST ON RECEIPT # SM485132030 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2005
  • NOTICE OF RULING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2005
  • MATTER SET FOR JURY TRIAL ON 12/12/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. WEF .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2005
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. WEF , HON. JOHN H. REID PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: A JURY TRIAL IS SET FOR 12-12-05, AT 8:30 A.M.,IN DEPARTMENT WE-F. TRIAL SETTING ORDER SIGNED AND FILED THIS DATE. COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT TO GIVE NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2005
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2005
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO WEF RE: HEARING OF 10/19/05 .

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2005
  • MATTER TRANSFERRED TO DIV. WEQ .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2005
  • COURTHOUSE CLOSURE/CASE TRANSFER/RESCHEDULE NOTICE FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2004
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (SHIN, JAE SEON) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2004
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (MITCHELL JR., JAY REGINALD) , (MONTGOMERY, ROBERT) DBA(MONTGOMERY MARKETING) , (MONTGOMERY MARKETING) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2004
  • ANSWER FILED OF (MITCHELL JR., JAY REGINALD) , (MONTGOMERY, ROBERT) DBA(MONTGOMERY MARKETING) . RECEIPT # CUL462301004 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2004
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY (MITCHELL JR., JAY REGINALD) , (MONTGOMERY, ROBERT) DBA(MONTGOMERY MARKETING) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2004
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (MONTGOMERY, ROBERT) , (MONTGOMERY MARKETING) . COSTS OF $ 87.90 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2004
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (MITCHELL JR., JAY REGINALD) . COSTS OF $ 43.95 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2004
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN CUL485132007.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2004
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LICHTGARN EVE