This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/20/2017 at 07:47:21 (UTC).

SHAPIRO, SUSAN VS. SCOTT, MICHAEL ALLEN

Case Summary

On 10/25/2012 SHAPIRO, SUSAN filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against SCOTT, MICHAEL ALLEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JUDITH ABRAMS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2584

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Beverly Hills Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JUDITH ABRAMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHAPIRO SUSAN

Defendant

SCOTT MICHAEL ALLEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT RECEIVED AND NEW CASE FILE OPENED. ALL PAPERS PREVIOUSLY FILED UNDER THIS CASE NUMBER ARE PLACED INTO THE NEW ASSIGNED CASE NUMBER 02C02584 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED. TOTAL JUDGMENT RENEWED IN THE SUM OF $ 13141.22 . RECEIPT # 451225025 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2012
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON THE APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT AS A FINAL DISPOSTION ON 10/25/12 , FOR (SHAPIRO, SUSAN) , AGAINST (SCOTT, MICHAEL ALLEN) , PRINCIPAL (LINE E) $ 8291.05 , INTEREST AFTER JUDGMENT (LINE F) $ 4820.17 , FEE FOR FILING RENEWAL (LINE G) $ 30.00 . TOTAL $ 13,141.22 . RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED ON 10/25/12 W/SAME CASE #02C02584 JUDGMENT RENEWED,,,OLD JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 03/17/2005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2012
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT STAYED UNTIL PROOF OF SERVICE IS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2007
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED, $ 1542.97 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2007
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 348.00 FILED BY (SHAPIRO, SUSAN) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2005
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 348.00 FILED BY (SHAPIRO, SUSAN) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2005
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED, $ 65.70 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2005
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. RECEIPT # BH278865090 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: JUDGMENT FILED. SERVED AS TO (SCOTT, MICHAEL ALLEN) . COSTS OF $ 0.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2003
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (SCOTT, MICHAEL ALLEN) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2003
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 006 , HON. JUDGE JUDITH ABRAMS PRESIDING FOR HEARING ON OSC WHY SANCTIONS OR A DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED. MATTER CONTINUED TO 09/30/03 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2003
  • NOTICE RE: RESPONSE TO THE COURT FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2003
  • CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER SIGNED AND FILED BY JUDGE JUDITH ABRAMS . MATTER SET FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS OR A DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO BRING THE CASE TO A FINAL DISPO STATUS . HEARING ON 08/18/03 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV/DEPT. 006 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2003
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2003
  • NOTICE RE: CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND PHONE NUMBER FILED BY PLAINTIFF .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2003
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (SCOTT, MICHAEL ALLEN) . COSTS OF $ 28.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2002
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN BH2788650003.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2002
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2002
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 05/21/03 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV/DEPT. 006 . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 12/23/02

    Read MoreRead Less