This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/13/2016 at 04:21:20 (UTC).

SEINO, KENT VS. HOPKINS, LANCE TRACEY

Case Summary

On 10/28/2004 SEINO, KENT filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HOPKINS, LANCE TRACEY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Malibu Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0181

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEINO KENT

Defendants

PACIFIC BUILDING IMPROVEMENTS INC. A CORPORATION

HOPKINS LANCE TRACEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF JASON MATISON - VANA PARKER MARGOLESE ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JASON MATISON

Defendant Attorney

THOMAS MOORE & ASSOCIATES - ROBERT H. EDGERTON

Attorney at THOMAS MOORE & ASSOCIATES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2006
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2006
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 06/29/06 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2005
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2005
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 06/06/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV/DEPT. 003 . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 03/30/05

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2005
  • ANSWER FILED OF (HOPKINS, LANCE TRACY) AND (PACIFIC BUILDING IMPROVEMENTS, INC.) . RECEIPT # MAL500503002 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2004
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW (1ST AMENDED) COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT, STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED. SERVED AS TO (HOPKINS, LANCE TRACEY) . COSTS OF $ 39.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2004
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW (1ST AMENDED) COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT, STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED. SERVED AS TO (PACIFIC BUILDING IMPROVEMENTS, INC.), A CORPORATION . COSTS OF $ 39.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2004
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED. RECEIPT # MAL500503002 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2004
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN MAL500503005.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2004
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2004
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 03/30/05 AT 10:00A M, IN DIV/DEPT. CLK . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 10/28/04

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2004
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT & CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARGOLESE VANA PARKER ESQ.