This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/19/2016 at 19:50:38 (UTC).

SBB CORP VS. MITRAHI, AVIV

Case Summary

On 04/26/2001 SBB CORP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MITRAHI, AVIV. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN W. GREEN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7776

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN W. GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SBB CORP DBA BILTWELL ROOFING

Defendant

MITRAHI AVIV

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2011
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2001
  • PARTY REPRESENTATIVE DECLARATION FILED FOR PLAINTIFF .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2001
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 005 , HON. JOHN W. GREEN, COMMR. PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2001
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 05/31/01 . FOR (SBB CORP ) DBA BILTWELL ROOFING . AGAINST (MITRAHI, AVIV) . PRINCIPAL $ 5000.00 . COSTS $ 62.00 . TOTAL $ 5062.00 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS. ORAL DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE. COURT AMENDS NAME OF DEFENDANT TO AVIV MITRAHI.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2001
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (MITRAHI, AVIV) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2001
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (MITRAVI, AUV) BY SUB-SERVING BRENDA MEJIA . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 05/31/01 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 006 COSTS OF $ 42.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2001
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN 279625052. HEARING SET FOR 05/31/01 AT 08:30 AM IN DIV. 006.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where S.B.B. is a litigant