This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2016 at 22:17:39 (UTC).

SARKISIAN, GABRIEL VS. RIEDEL, KENNETH WALTER

Case Summary

On 07/05/2005 SARKISIAN, GABRIEL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RIEDEL, KENNETH WALTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Malibu Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0127

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Malibu Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SARKISIAN RICHARD

SARKISIAN MICHAEL

SARKISIAN GABRIEL

DIAZ-SARKISIAN GRISELDA

SARKISIAN STEVEN

Defendant

RIEDEL KENNETH WALTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF ROGER B. SHEINBEIN - ROGER B. SHEINBEIN

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ROGER B. SHEINBEIN

Defendant Attorney

SILVA A. CLASEN & RAFFALOW - YVONNE BIRCH ESQ

Attorney at SILVA A. CLASEN & RAFFALOW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2007
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2007
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 09/07/07 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2005
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2005
  • NOTICE RE: CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT. A REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WILL BE FILED NO LATER THAN DECEMBER 1, 2005 IS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2005
  • ANSWER FILED OF (RIEDEL, KENNETH WALTER) . RECEIPT # MAL136401008 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2005
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY (RIEDEL, KENNETH WALTER) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2005
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN MAL136401010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2005
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2005
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 12/07/05 AT 10:00A M, IN DIV/DEPT. CLK . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 07/08/05

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2005
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.