This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/12/2016 at 08:25:20 (UTC).

SANGHAVI DIAMONDS INC VS. ABE ABRAHAMOFF DIAMOND IMPORTER INC

Case Summary

On 12/11/2000 SANGHAVI DIAMONDS INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ABE ABRAHAMOFF DIAMOND IMPORTER INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4676

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2000

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANGHAVI DIAMONDS INC

Defendants

ABRAHAMOFF ABE

ABE ABRAHAMOFF DIAMOND IMPORTER INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFC OF TIMOTHY KRANTZ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2003
  • CASE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GC 68152 D (1) & (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2001
  • HEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2001
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE-ENTIRE ACTION, FILED & ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2001
  • OSC SET 07/23/01, 0830 AM, DIV/DEPT 8B, RM 426, NOTICE FILED & MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2001
  • CORRESPONDENCE RECEIVED FROM DEFENDANT ABE ABRAHAMOFF IS LODGED ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2000
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ABE ABRAHAMOFF DIAMOND IMPORTER INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SANGHAVI DIAMONDS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Law Office of Timothy Krantz