This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2016 at 22:17:14 (UTC).

SANCHEZ, FRANCISCO FRANCISCO VS. BOTTOMLY, NATHANIEL WHITTIER

Case Summary

On 06/30/2005 SANCHEZ, FRANCISCO FRANCISCO filed an Other lawsuit against BOTTOMLY, NATHANIEL WHITTIER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Malibu Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS and TERRY ADAMSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0123

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Malibu Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS

Presiding Judge

TERRY ADAMSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

SANCHEZ FRANCISCO FRANCISCO

ASTUDILLO LUIS

GONZALEZ ROSA

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

BOTTOMLY NATHANIEL WHITTIER

SLOCUM BENTLEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF ALAN TAJER - ALAN TAJER ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ALAN TAJER

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF BEVERLY I. MILLS - BEVERLY I MILLS

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF BEVERLY I. MILLS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2009
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2009
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 02/10/09 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2006
  • MARCH 6, 2006 NOTICE OF RULING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2006
  • ORDER RE: GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MEMORANDUM OF COSTS SIGNED BY COMMISSIONER TERRY ADAMSON AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2006
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 552.00 FILED BY (BOTTOMLY, NATHANIEL WHITTIER) , (SLOCUM, BENTLEY) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2006
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DIVISION 001 FOR CONSIDERATION OF PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MEMORANDUM OF COSTS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2006
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 09:00A M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. TERRY ADAMSON PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: MOTION TO TAX COST BOTH PARTIES PRESENT BY AND THROUGH ATTORNEY OF RECORD. COURT PARTIALLY GRANTS PLAINTIFF'S MOTION. COSTS TAXED FOR TOTAL SUM OF $552.00. MOTION DENIED AS TO SANCTIONS AND ANY ADDITIONAL COSTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2006
  • CLERK`S NOTICE OF RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO TAX COST FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2006
  • DECLARATION RE: OF ERIC BRYAN SEUTHE IN REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO TAX FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2006
  • OPPOSITION RE: PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO TAX COSTS FILED BY (BOTTOMLY, NATHANIEL WHITTIER) . HEARING SET FOR 03/06/06 AT 8:30AM IN DIVISION 003

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 07/07/2005
  • NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS , DECLARATION, AND POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF FILED. RECEIPT # MAL136401011 . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 08/15/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2005
  • DOCUMENTS ON TRANSFER RECEIVED AND FILED. RECEIPT # CCH243111060 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2005
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RECEIPT # CH451233040 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2005
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 12/07/05 AT 10:00A M, IN DIV/DEPT. CLK . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 07/07/05

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT FILED. SERVED AS TO (BOTTOMLY, NATHANIEL WHITTIER) . COSTS OF $ 16.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2005
  • ANSWER FILED OF (BOTTOMLY, NATHANIEL WHITTIER) , (SLOCUM, BENTLEY) . RECEIPT # CCH451233030 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2005
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED. CROSS-COMPLAINANT(S): (BOTTOMLY, NATHANIEL WHITTIER) , (SLOCUM, BENTLEY) . CROSS-DEFENDANT(S): (SANCHEZ, FRANCISCO FRANCISCO) . RECEIPT # CCH451233031 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2005
  • NOTICE OF MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE , DECLARATION, AND POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF FILED. RECEIPT # LAC503153007 . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 05/12/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. CLK .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2005
  • ORDER RE: CHANGE OF VENUE SIGNED BY JUDGE YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2005
  • ANSWER OF CROSS-DEFENDANT(S): (SANCHEZ, FRANCISCO FRANCISCO) TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF CROSS-COMPLAINANT(S): (BOTTOMLY, NATHANIEL WHITTIER) , (SLOCUM, BENTLEY) FILED. RECEIPT # NA .

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.