This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/20/2017 at 07:41:34 (UTC).

SAN ANTONIO RICHARD VS. SANTOSTEFANO CYNTHIA

Case Summary

On 07/30/2012 SAN ANTONIO RICHARD filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against SANTOSTEFANO CYNTHIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HUGH M. BOBYS CMM'R. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0996

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Beverly Hills Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HUGH M. BOBYS CMM'R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAN ANTONIO RICHARD

Defendant

SANTOSTEFANO CYNTHIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF NEIL C. EVANS - NEIL C EVANS

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF NEIL C. EVANS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2012
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED AS TO (SANTOSTEFANO CYNTHIA) . DATE OF SERVICE WAS ON 08/15/12 . NO ENFORCEABLE EXECUTION TO ISSUE PRIOR TO 09/17/12 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT RECEIVED AND NEW CASE FILE OPENED. ALL PAPERS PREVIOUSLY FILED UNDER THIS CASE NUMBER ARE PLACED INTO THE NEW ASSIGNED CASE NUMBER 02U00996 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED. TOTAL JUDGMENT RENEWED IN THE SUM OF $ 3364.10 . RECEIPT # 535206010 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2012
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED, $ 1631.12 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2012
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON THE APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT AS A FINAL DISPOSTION ON 07/30/12 , FOR (SAN ANTONIO RICHARD) , AGAINST (SANTOSTEFANO CYNTHIA) , PRINCIPAL (LINE E) $ 1702.98 , INTEREST AFTER JUDGMENT (LINE F) $ 1631.12 , FEE FOR FILING RENEWAL (LINE G) $ 30.00 . TOTAL $ 3,364.10 . RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED ON 07/30/12 W/SAME CASE #02U00996 JUDGMENT RENEWED,,,OLD JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 12/27/2002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2012
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT STAYED UNTIL PROOF OF SERVICE IS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2011
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY WHOLLY UNSATISFIED. COSTS $ 30.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2010
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ON BEHALF OF (SAN ANTONIO RICHARD) , RECEIPT NO. BH016331018 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2010
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED FOR PLAINTIFF (SAN ANTONIO RICHARD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2010
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED, $ 1287.80 .

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2002
  • SUMMONS PURSUANT TO CCP 415.46 WITH PROOF OF SERVICE THEREON FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2002
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP; DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2002
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2002
  • ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION(S) FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS OF (SANTOSTEFANO CYNTHIA) SIGNED AND FILED. APPLICANT(S) PERMITTED TO PROCEED WITHOUT PAYMENT OF THE FOLLOWING COURT FEES AND COSTS: GRANTED IN WHOLE: NO PAYMENTS OF ALL FEES AND COSTS LISTED IN CAL RULES OF COURT, RULE 985(I) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2002
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS AS TO (SANTOSTEFANO CYNTHIA) RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO DIV. 004 FOR CONSIDERATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2002
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY (SANTOSTEFANO CYNTHIA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2002
  • GENERAL DENIAL FILED OF (SANTOSTEFANO CYNTHIA) . RECEIPT # FEE WAIVED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2002
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2002
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN BH278865004.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2002
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less